EP4114423 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INTRACELLULAR BACTERIAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endolytix Technology, Inc. 48 Dunham Ridge, Suite 5850 Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLDER, Jason 180 Bradlee Ave. Swampscott, MA 01907 / US | 02 /
MAGNANT, Gary, P. 47 Fox Run Road Topsfield, MA 01983 / US | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21763880.8 | 08.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021US21399 | Priority number, date | US202062986592P | 06.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062986592 P | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021178969 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4114423 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, A61P31/04, C12N7/00, C12N7/02, C12Q1/70 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/5123 (KR);
A61K38/47 (KR,US);
A61K31/133 (US);
A61K31/407 (US);
A61K31/4709 (US);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/546 (US);
A61K31/7036 (US);
A61K31/7048 (US);
A61K35/76 (US);
A61K38/164 (KR);
A61K38/46 (KR);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K47/6911 (US);
A61K47/6913 (US);
A61K9/1075 (KR);
A61K9/127 (KR);
A61K9/1272 (US);
C12Y302/01001 (US);
C12Y302/01017 (US);
C12Y302/01068 (US);
C12N2795/10022 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG INTRAZELLULÄRER BAKTERIELLER INFEKTIONEN | [2023/02] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF INTRACELLULAR BACTERIAL INFECTIONS | [2023/02] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS BACTÉRIENNES INTRACELLULAIRES | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 28.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO03072014 (MPEX BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al); | International search | [A]WO2008026075 (VERENIGING HET NL KANKER I [NL], et al) [A] 1-5, 7-11, 42-46* entire document *; | [A]US2015204845 (DE ARMAS LESLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 7-11, 42-46 * entire document *; | [XA]US9278141 (MATTEY MICHAEL [GB], et al) [X] 1-5, 7-11, 42-46 * entire document * [A] 1-5, 7-11, 42-46; | [A] - Shen Yang, Barros Marilia, Vennemann Tarek, Gallagher D Travis, Yin Yizhou, Linden Sara B, Heselpoth Ryan D, Spencer Dennis J, Donovan David M, Moult John, Fischetti Vincent A, Heinrich Frank, Lösche Mathias, Nelson Daniel C, "A bacteriophage endolysin that eliminates intracellular streptococci", Elife, (20160315), vol. 5, pages 1 - 26, XP055854883 [A] 1-5, 7-11, 42-46 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.13152 |