EP4116054 - REINFORCING-FIBER COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYOSHI, Katsuhiro c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Tadashi c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 03 /
ONO, Yasukazu c/o Nagoya Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 9-1, Oe- cho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-8502 / JP | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21765040.7 | 01.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021JP07642 | Priority number, date | JP20200034762 | 02.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020034762 | [2023/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021177215 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4116054 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B29B15/12 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
B29B15/122 (EP);
C08J5/243 (EP,US);
C08J5/042 (EP);
B29B11/16 (US);
C08J2333/04 (US);
C08J2363/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | B29B11/16, C08J5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | FASERVERSTÄRKTES VERBUNDSTOFFMATERIAL | [2023/02] | English: | REINFORCING-FIBER COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2023/02] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE À FIBRES DE RENFORCEMENT | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2022 | Translation filed | 23.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 11.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006125156 (WOOLHOUSE ARTHUR W [GB]); | [A]JP2009062648 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2009274412 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]EP3421207 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | International search | [A]WO2008149615 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-8; | [A]JP2009062474 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8; | [A]WO2016047412 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-8; | [A]WO2017145884 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-8; | [A]WO2018143067 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-8; | [PA]WO2020067058 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP])[PA] 1-8 | by applicant | WO2008149615 | WO2017145884 |