EP4116295 - TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HELIOEAST PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 789 Huoju Street High-tech Industrial Development Zone Nanchang JiangXi 330096 / CN | For all designated states Helioeast Science & Technology Co., Ltd. 789 Huoju Street High-tech Industrial Development Zone Nanchang JiangXi 330096 / CN | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Lingyun 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Peng 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Lele 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 04 /
LI, Jian 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Shuhui 288 Futezhong Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 21765186.8 | 02.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021CN78744 | Priority number, date | CN202010144417 | 04.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010144417 | CN202010464135 | 27.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010464135 | [2023/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021175225 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4116295 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/4439, A61P37/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | C07D273/02, C07D277/04, C07D285/08, C07D239/24, C07D213/64, A61K31/41, A61K31/395, A61K31/433, A61P37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2023/02] | English: | TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS AND USE THEREOF | [2023/02] | French: | COMPOSÉS TRICYCLIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2022 | Translation filed | 29.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011060392 (RECEPTOS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]WO2018028557 (MEDSHINE DISCOVERY INC [CN]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2010148649 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * entire document, in particular description, pages 3-4, compound of formula (I) *; | [A]CN102724880 (RECEPTOS INC) [A] 1-12 * see entire document, in particular description, paragraphs 0007-0018 *; | [A]CN107857760 (NANJING TIANXIANG PHARMACEUTICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-12* see entire document, in particular description, paragraphs 0004-0015 *; | [X]WO2018157813 (MEDSHINE DISCOVERY INC [CN]) [X] 1-12 * see description pages 1-4, description page 16 paragraph 3, description page 44 embodiment 9, description page 50 embodiment 20 * |