EP4115494 - AUTOMOTIVE CAR SEAT WIRELESS CHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yank Technologies, Inc. 19 Morris Avenue Brooklyn Navy Yard Building 128 Brooklyn, NY 11205 / US | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANKOWITZ, Joshua Aaron 19 Morris Avenue Brooklyn Navy Yard Building 128 Brooklyn, NY 11205 / US | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/02] | Application number, filing date | 21765408.6 | 05.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021US21121 | Priority number, date | US202062985742P | 05.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062985742 P | [2023/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021178821 | Date: | 10.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4115494 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/10, H02J50/00, H02J50/12, H02J50/27, H02J50/40 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H02J50/005 (EP);
H02J50/40 (IL,KR);
H02J50/23 (US);
B60N2/90 (US);
B60R16/03 (KR,US);
H01Q1/22 (KR);
H01Q1/38 (KR);
H02J50/12 (EP,IL,KR);
H02J50/402 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (KR,US);
H02J2310/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/02] | H02J50/10, H02J50/00, H02J50/12, H02J50/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES LADESYSTEM FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGSITZ | [2023/02] | English: | AUTOMOTIVE CAR SEAT WIRELESS CHARGING SYSTEM | [2023/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHARGEMENT SANS FIL SUR SIÈGE DE VOITURE AUTOMOBILE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 20.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013005251 (SOAR ROGER J [CA]) [A] 9,15 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2014252813 (LEE HUANG [US], et al) [A] 9,15* figure 3 *; | [Y]US2018294677 (YANKOWITZ JOSHUA AARON [US]) [Y] 4 * figure 19 * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0103] *; | [XAY]US2019260238 (CHO CHAN KI [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-14 * figures 1,2,4,6,13,14,15 * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0183] * * paragraph [0188] * * paragraph [0159] * * paragraph [0066] * [A] 9,15 [Y] 4 | International search | [Y]US2013005251 (SOAR ROGER J [CA]) [Y] 13,20,23,24 * entire document *; | [XY]US2013300358 (KIRBY MILES A [US], et al) [X] 19 * entire document * [Y] 1-18, 20-24; | [Y]US2015160254 (HUYNH CUONG T [US], et al) [Y] 12 * entire document *; | [A]US2016036263 (LIAO KUANG-YAO [TW]) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016329752 (BAE SU HO [KR]) [Y] 14-18 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017317529 (SMITH JOSHUA R [US], et al) [Y] 11, 15-17 * entire document *; | [A]US9876379 (LEABMAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018177075 (KWEON KYOUNGCHUN [KR], et al) [Y] 10 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018262050 (YANKOWITZ JOSHUA AARON [US]) [Y] 4 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018294677 (YANKOWITZ JOSHUA AARON [US]) [Y] 2-4, 22 * entire document *; | [Y]US2019068139 (KROPFITSCH MICHAEL [AT], et al) [Y] 18 * entire document *; | [A]US2019214354 (SOLIMAN YASSER KHAIRAT [CA], et al) [A] 1-24* entire document *; | [Y]US2019260238 (CHO CHAN KI [KR], et al) [Y] 1-13, 21 * entire document * |