EP4320053 - OPTIMIZED THERMAL BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pegaf S.r.l. Via Nazionale, 203 89134 Reggio di Calabria (RC) / IT | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUALTIERI, Elvira 89134 Reggio Di Calabria (RC) / IT | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Giuliano, Natalia C/o Studio Rubino SRL Via Lucrezia della Valle, 84 88100 Catanzaro (CZ) / IT | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 21766004.2 | 31.08.2021 | [2024/07] | WO2021IB57946 | Priority number, date | IT20210008594 | 07.04.2021 Original published format: IT202100008594 | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022214863 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4320053 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/38, A47J41/02 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
B65D81/3841 (EP);
A47J41/028 (EP,US);
A47J41/0027 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE WÄRMEFLASCHE | [2024/07] | English: | OPTIMIZED THERMAL BOTTLE | [2024/07] | French: | BOUTEILLE THERMIQUE OPTIMISÉE | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 06.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2024741 (SAMUEL OSTERMAN) [X] 1,4-6 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 49 * * column 2, line 6 - line 14 *; | [X]US2405764 (SMITH EDGAR C) [X] 1,4-6 * figure 4 *; | [X]US3245565 (ZEPPENFELD JOHN S, et al) [X] 1-3,7 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US7975868 (FLIES MATTHEW B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 18 * * column 4, line 18 *; | [X]US2012241446 (SCHWARTZ MICHAEL H [US]) [X] 1,4,5,8 * abstract ** paragraph [0029] *; | [X]US2019231102 (DAHAB CHRISTINA [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * | by applicant | CN109452881 | KR20200011017 |