EP4208725 - BATTERY STATE OF HEALTH ESTIMATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states Audi AG Auto-Union-Straße 1 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENN, Melanie Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
WOLF, Joerg, Christian Foster City, California 94404 / US | 03 /
HAGHENBECK EMDE, Lorenz Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Rittner, Karsten Rittner & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Schiffgraben 17 30159 Hannover / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21766146.1 | 19.08.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021EP73081 | Priority number, date | US202017011103 | 03.09.2020 Original published format: US202017011103 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022048920 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208725 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4208725 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/392, G01R31/367 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G01R31/392 (EP,US);
G01R31/367 (EP);
G06N3/088 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DES BATTERIEZUSTANDS | [2023/28] | English: | BATTERY STATE OF HEALTH ESTIMATOR | [2023/28] | French: | ESTIMATEUR D'ÉTAT DE SANTÉ DE BATTERIE | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 21.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NL | 27.03.2024 | SE | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
SE | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019019080 (CLAESSENS BERT [BE], et al) [A] 1,8,15 * figure 1 *; | [A]CN111027625 (UNIV YANSHAN) [A] 1,8,15* figures 1, 2 * |