EP4210544 - A KIT COMPRISING A CAMPING MATTRESS AND A ROOF TENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/29] | A CAMPING MATTRESS | ||
[2024/44] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tentbox Ltd 18 Brick Lane Romsey Southampton Hampshire SO51 8LG / GB | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHURVILLE, Oliver Romsey Southampton Hampshire SO51 8LG / GB | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/29] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21766203.0 | 25.08.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021GB52206 | Priority number, date | GB20200014338 | 11.09.2020 Original published format: GB 202014338 | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053777 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210544 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/00, A45F4/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
A47C20/04 (EP,US);
A47C17/70 (GB,US);
A47C17/64 (GB);
A47C17/80 (GB,US);
A47C27/00 (GB);
A47C27/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Title | German: | KIT BESTEHEND AUS EINER CAMPINGMATRAZE UND EINEM ZELT | [2024/44] | English: | A KIT COMPRISING A CAMPING MATTRESS AND A ROOF TENT | [2024/44] | French: | KIT COMPOSÉ D'UN MATELAS DE CAMPING ET D'UNE TENTE | [2024/44] |
Former [2023/29] | CAMPINGMATRATZE | ||
Former [2023/29] | A CAMPING MATTRESS | ||
Former [2023/29] | MATELAS DE CAMPING | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5560056 (TAI TSAI-TING [TW]); | [XI]CN201370332Y (JIHUA 3517 RUBBBER PRODUCTION CO LTD); | [XI]CN207550043U (JIN LONGYING) |