EP4120519 - GEAR MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-6025 / JP | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Taizo c/o Yokosuka Works of Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. 19, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-8555 / JP | 02 /
MINARI, Takahiro c/o Yokosuka Works of Sumitomo Heavy Industries, Ltd. 19, Natsushima-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-8555 / JP | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21766940.7 | 12.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021JP10073 | Priority number, date | JP20200043720 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020043720 | [2023/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021182612 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120519 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/10 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H02K7/003 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (US);
H02K7/11 (EP);
H02K49/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | GETRIEBEMOTOR | [2023/03] | English: | GEAR MOTOR | [2023/03] | French: | MOTEUR À ENGRENAGES | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2022 | Translation filed | 14.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 24.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015076948 (KATOU HIDENORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6* paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0122]; figure 31 *; | [X]DE102018110151 (LINZ CENTER OF MECHATRONICS GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1,3,8,9 *; | [E]US2021265905 (JUNGMAYR GERALD [AT], et al) [E] 1-5,7-11 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1,3 * | International search | [Y]JPH11164535 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 6, 8-11* , paragraphs [0020], [0021], fig. 3 *; | [XY]JP2007116837 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1-5, 7 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0023], fig. 1, 2 * [Y] 6, 8-11 | by applicant | JP3916337B |