EP4119688 - STEEL SHEET FOR WIND POWER GENERATION PLANTS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRAISHI, Ryotaro c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
SUMIYA, Satoshi c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
SHINOHARA, Yasuhiro c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION, 6-1, Marunouchi 2- chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21767247.6 | 12.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021JP10109 | Priority number, date | JP20200044280 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020044280 | [2023/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021182618 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4119688 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C22C38/58 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/58 (KR);
B21B15/0007 (KR);
B22D11/16 (EP);
C21D1/02 (EP);
C21D1/60 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D8/021 (EP);
C21D8/0215 (KR);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR);
C22C38/001 (KR);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (KR);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/42 (EP,KR);
C22C38/44 (EP,KR);
C22C38/46 (EP,KR);
C22C38/48 (KR);
C22C38/50 (EP,KR);
C22C38/54 (KR);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR);
C21D2211/005 (EP,KR);
C21D2261/00 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | STAHLBLECH FÜR WINDKRAFTANLAGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2023/03] | English: | STEEL SHEET FOR WIND POWER GENERATION PLANTS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2023/03] | French: | FEUILLE D'ACIER POUR INSTALLATIONS DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉOLIENNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2022 | Translation filed | 26.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06240355 (SUMITOMO METAL IND)[A] 1-5; | [A]JP2007296542 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2007302908 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2013028852 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 | by applicant | JP2011246805 | JP2011246807 | JP2012122116 | JP2012122117 | JP2013028852 | JP2013043579 | JP2020044280 |