EP4044174 - TEXT INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Jingdong Shangke Information Technology Co., Ltd. 8th Floor of Building No.76 Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100195 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Jingdong Century Trading Co., Ltd. Room 201, 2/F, Block C No. 18 Kechuang 11th Street Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Liumeng Room 201, 2/f, Block C, No.18, Kechuang 11th Street, Beijing Economic And Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
SONG, Wei Room 201, 2/f, Block C, No.18, Kechuang 11th Street, Beijing Economic And Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
WU, Zhizheng Room 201, 2/f, Block C, No.18, Kechuang 11th Street, Beijing Economic And Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 21767958.8 | 15.01.2021 | [2022/33] | WO2021CN72016 | Priority number, date | CN202010172575 | 12.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010172575 | [2022/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021179791 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044174 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/08, G06F40/279, G06F40/30, G10L13/02, G10L13/047 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
G10L13/047 (EP);
G10L13/08 (EP,CN,US);
G06F40/30 (US);
G10L13/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | G10L13/08, G06F40/279, G06F40/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON TEXTINFORMATIONEN | [2022/33] | English: | TEXT INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS TEXTUELLES | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2022 | Translation filed | 21.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 27.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015364128 (ZHAO PEI [CN], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A] - SHEN JONATHAN ET AL, "Natural TTS Synthesis by Conditioning Wavenet on MEL Spectrogram Predictions", 2018 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), IEEE, (20180415), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2018.8461368, pages 4779 - 4783, XP033403934 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2018.8461368 | [A] - Yuxuan Wang ET AL, "TACOTRON: TOWARDS END-TO-END SPEECH SYN- THESIS", (20170406), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1703.10135.pdf, (20190715), XP055605636 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - NAIHAN LI ET AL, "Neural Speech Synthesis with Transformer Network", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20180919), XP081016874 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1731509 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]US2012191457 (MINNIS STEPHEN [GB], et al) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [A]CN107077841 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]) [A] 1-12 * description paragraphs [0025]-[0090] *; | [A]CN109446333 (SHENLAN ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE CHIP RES INSTITUTE JIANGSU CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN110634466 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [PX]CN111785248 (BEIJING JINGDONG SHANGKE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [PX] 1-12 * claims 1-10, description paragraphs [0001]-[0225] * |