EP4118010 - ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT STERILIZING WASTE CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Munchkin, Inc. 7835 Gloria Avenue Van Nuys, CA 91406 / US | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNN, Steven Bryan 2069 Coldwater Canyon Beverly Hills, California 90210 / US | 02 /
BIRKERT, Thomas Edward 23464 Haynes St. West Hills, California 91307 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Kevin Douglas 18333 Hatteras St., 43 Tarzana, California 91356 / US | 04 /
LAUDI, Michael John 2727 Ellendale Pl. Los Angeles, California 90007 / US | 05 /
TRUMBO, Nicholas Arthur 24174 View Pointe Ln. Valencia, California 91355 / US | 06 /
CHAN, Sung Yun 1434 Wesley Avenue Pasadena, California 91104 / US | 07 /
LAI, Ip Hing Room 2701, Siu Yan House Siu Hong Court Northern Territories Hong Kong / CN | 08 /
MAN, Cheung Yik Flat 1, 7/F, Golden Peace Ct. Golden Lion Garden 1-3 Kak Tin Street Northern Territories,Tai Wai Hong Kong / CN | 09 /
TAK, Ho Wing Blk 2, 40/F, Flat A, Well On Garden Tseung Kwan O Northern Territories Hong Kong / CN | 10 /
LOK, Luk Ka Flat F, 16/F, Block 4 Parkland Villas Phase 1 Tuen Mun Hong Kong / CN | 11 /
HO, Chan Kim Flat 610, 36 Lai Tak Tsuen Road Tai Hang Hong Kong / CN | 12 /
TEBBE, Mark Gerard 367 Homever Ave. Ventura, California 93003 / US | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21768313.5 | 10.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021US21786 | Priority number, date | US202062987683P | 10.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062987683 P | US202063028212P | 21.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063028212 P | US202063037571P | 10.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063037571 P | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021183698 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4118010 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/14, B65F1/00, B65F1/04, B65F1/06, B65F1/16 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
B65F1/163 (EP,US);
A61L2/10 (EP,US);
A61L11/00 (EP,US);
A61L2/24 (US);
B65F1/062 (EP,US);
B65F1/068 (EP);
B65F1/16 (US);
B65F1/1646 (EP);
A61L2202/122 (EP,US);
A61L2202/14 (EP,US);
A61L2202/23 (US);
B65F2001/1653 (EP);
B65F2210/126 (EP);
B65F2210/128 (EP);
B65F2210/129 (EP,US);
B65F2210/1675 (EP);
B65F2210/168 (EP,US);
B65F2210/172 (EP);
B65F2230/00 (EP);
B65F2240/132 (EP,US);
B65F2250/11 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | ULTRAVIOLETTLICHT-STERILISATIONSABFALLBEHÄLTER | [2023/03] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT STERILIZING WASTE CONTAINERS | [2023/03] | French: | CONTENANTS DE DÉCHETS À STÉRILISATION PAR LUMIÈRE ULTRAVIOLETTE | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2013134124 (COHN STEVEN CHARLES [US], et al); | [Y]US2015324760 (BOROWSKI DAVID V [US], et al); | [Y]CN206108115U (UNIV XIAMEN TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]US2018110893 (CHANG KWANG OK [KR]); | [Y]TWM561665U (CHANG WEN CHUNG [TW]) | International search | [XY]WO2013134124 (COHN STEVEN CHARLES [US], et al); | [XY]US2015324760 (BOROWSKI DAVID V [US], et al); | [XY]US2018110893 (CHANG KWANG OK [KR]) |