EP4102877 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Chuting Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
KUANG, Yiru Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Jian Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
XU, Bo Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21768945.4 | 02.03.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021CN78747 | Priority number, date | CN202010162964 | 10.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010162964 | [2022/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021179962 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102877 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, // H04L5/00, H04W8/24 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04W48/08 (CN);
H04W72/12 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W8/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | H04W24/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/50] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2022 | Translation filed | 06.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 08.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2019033058 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 15, line 21 - page 25, line 222 * * figures 3-7 *; | [I]CN110049509 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XPI]EP3737147 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [XP] 1,2,9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0136] * * figures 2-8 * [I] 1-15; | [I] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Measurement need for gap capability transfer enhancements for EN-DC and NR SA", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, United State; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171117), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1712693, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F100/Docs/, (20171117), XP051371607 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - NOKIA ET AL, "Need for measurement gap before EN-DC configuration", vol. RAN WG4, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180820 - 20180824, (20180810), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1810590, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG4%5FRadio/TSGR4%5F88/Docs/R4%2D1810590%2Ezip, (20180810), XP051579524 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN107820726 (SHENZHEN QIANHAI DATA CLOUD INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [A]US2019097877 (YIU CANDY [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [A]CN109788497 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-24; | [A] - Nokia, Nokia Shanghai Bell, "Consideration on Measurement configuration in NR-DC", 3GPP Draft; R2-1814529 Consideration on measurement configuration in NR-DC, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20180928), vol. RAN WG2, no. Chengdu, China; 20181008 - 20181012, XP051523954 [A] 1-24 * sections 1-5 * |