EP4119239 - PLANAR LIQUID FILM FORMING METHOD AND PLANAR LIQUID FILM FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Musashi Engineering, Inc. 1-11-6, Iguchi Mitaka-shi, Tokyo 181-0011 / JP | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKUSHIMA, Kazumasa c/o Musashi Engineering, Inc., 1-11-6, Iguchi Mitaka-shi, Tokyo 181-0011 / JP | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21769000.7 | 01.03.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021JP07599 | Priority number, date | JP20200041946 | 11.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020041946 | [2023/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021182146 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4119239 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B05C11/10, B05D1/26, B05C5/00 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
B05D1/26 (EP,KR,US);
B05C5/027 (EP,KR,US);
B05C11/10 (KR,US);
B05C11/1031 (KR);
B05C11/1034 (KR);
B05C13/02 (KR);
B05C5/0212 (KR);
B05C5/0216 (EP);
B05C5/0225 (EP,KR);
B05C5/0245 (KR);
B05C5/0291 (EP,KR);
B05D5/00 (EP);
B05D5/06 (KR);
G02F1/13 (KR);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
G02F1/133512 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINES FLACHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSFILMS UND GERÄT ZUR BILDUNG EINES FLACHEN FLÜSSIGKEITSFILMS | [2023/03] | English: | PLANAR LIQUID FILM FORMING METHOD AND PLANAR LIQUID FILM FORMING APPARATUS | [2023/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FILM LIQUIDE PLAN ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION DE FILM LIQUIDE PLAN | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2022 | Translation filed | 07.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 04.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP3056944 (MIMOTEC S A [CH]); | [A]US2017066005 (IKUSHIMA KAZUMASA [JP]); | [A]US2018186143 (DEFILLIPI MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]DE112017002727T (MUSASHI ENG INC [JP]); | [XYI]KR20200012826 (MUSASHI ENG INC [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH05309310 (SANTSUULE KK) [A] 1-14* , whole document *; | [A]JP2003245596 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * , whole document *; | [A]JP2007167844 (NORDSON CORP) [A] 1-14 * , whole document *; | [A]JP2008104998 (NORDSON CORP) [A] 1-14 * , whole document *; | [A]JP2013052351 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-14 * , whole document *; | [A]WO2015137271 (MUSASHI ENGINEERING INC [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , whole document *; | [A]JP2017023958 (MUSASHI ENG KK) [A] 1-14 * , whole document *; | [A]WO2018221432 (MUSASHI ENG INC [JP]) [A] 1-14 * , whole document * | by applicant | JP2007524506 | WO2015137271 | WO2018221432 |