EP4102864 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS FOR SIDELINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Jun c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XU, Haibo c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
FAN, Qiang c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
XIAO, Xiao c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 21769039.5 | 09.03.2021 | [2022/50] | WO2021CN79779 | Priority number, date | CN202010162936 | 10.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010162936 | [2022/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021180079 | Date: | 16.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102864 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/40, H04W52/02, H04W76/28, // H04W76/23 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/40 (CN);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W52/0209 (CN);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W76/14 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/50] | H04W4/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT FÜR SIDELINKS | [2022/50] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS FOR SIDELINKS | [2022/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION POUR LIAISONS LATÉRALES | [2022/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2022 | Translation filed | 07.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 04.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018064477 (INTEL IP CORP [US]); | [X]US2018206252 (THANGARASA SANTHAN [SE], et al); | International search | [A]US2018206252 (THANGARASA SANTHAN [SE], et al); | [X]CN108307486 (SONY CORP); | [X]CN109479189 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]US2019098689 (WEI CHIA-HUNG [TW], et al) |