EP4192756 - PACK PROVIDED WITH AT LEAST ONE BLISTER OPENABLE BY MEANS OF SLIDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'ALFONSO, Lorena 40133 Bologna / IT | 02 /
POLLONI, Roberto 40133 Bologna / IT | 03 /
GAMBERINI, Giuliano 40133 Bologna / IT | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2024/23] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Viale Antonio Silvani, 6 40122 Bologna / IT | ||
Former [2023/24] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 21769184.9 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021IB57371 | Priority number, date | IT20200019879 | 10.08.2020 Original published format: IT202000019879 | [2023/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022034500 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4192756 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4192756 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/18, B65D77/20, B65D43/20 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B65D77/2032 (EP,US);
B65D43/20 (EP,US);
B65B11/52 (US);
B65D51/18 (EP);
B65D75/366 (US);
B65D75/367 (US);
B65D77/2088 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0021 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0093 (EP,US);
B65D2401/25 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00194 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00268 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | B65D75/36, B65D75/32, B65D83/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM DURCH SCHIEBEN ZU ÖFFNENDEN BLISTER | [2023/24] | English: | PACK PROVIDED WITH AT LEAST ONE BLISTER OPENABLE BY MEANS OF SLIDING | [2023/24] | French: | EMBALLAGE MUNI D'AU MOINS UNE COQUE POUVANT ÊTRE OUVERTE PAR COULISSEMENT | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 15.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US3707274 (HAUSLER THOMAS, et al); | [A]GB1384547 (DRG PACKAGING LTD); | [YA]GB2085844 (DELYN CARTONS LTD); | [A]US4491161 (TAMURA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3407123 (NOETHEN KG WILLIBALD [DE]); | [XAI]US5269404 (WISCHUSEN III HENRY [US], et al); | [I]DE4408001 (ILLIG MASCHINENBAU ADOLF [DE]); | [A]US6997320 (KANCSAR PETER [CH], et al); | [A]US2012043323 (THOMAS LAUREL [US], et al); | [A]WO2016166240 (NESTEC SA [CH]); | [IY]WO2019065734 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) |