EP4200654 - EDGE-PRESERVING GAUSSIAN GRID SMOOTHING OF NOISE COMPONENTS IN SUBSURFACE GRIDS TO GENERATE GEOLOGICAL MAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEYAB, Abdullah A. Dhahran, 31311 / SA | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21769276.3 | 18.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021US46542 | Priority number, date | US202016996639 | 18.08.2020 Original published format: US202016996639 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022040337 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200654 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01V99/00, G01V1/30 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G01V1/302 (EP);
G01V1/345 (US);
G01V1/181 (US);
G01V20/00 (EP);
G01V2210/324 (EP,US);
G01V2210/63 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | KANTENERHALTENDE GAUSS-GITTER-GLÄTTUNG VON RAUSCHKOMPONENTEN IN UNTERIRDISCHEN GITTERN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON GEOLOGISCHEN KARTEN | [2023/26] | English: | EDGE-PRESERVING GAUSSIAN GRID SMOOTHING OF NOISE COMPONENTS IN SUBSURFACE GRIDS TO GENERATE GEOLOGICAL MAPS | [2023/26] | French: | LISSAGE DE GRILLE GAUSSIENNE PRÉSERVANT LES BORDS DE COMPOSANTES DE BRUIT DANS DES GRILLES SOUTERRAINES POUR GÉNÉRER DES CARTES GÉOLOGIQUES | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 21.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 10.10.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/10] | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |