EP4232729 - HEATING, VENTILATING AND AIR CONDITIONING ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belimo Holding AG Brunnenbachstrasse 1 8340 Hinwil / CH | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROGG, Silvio 8620 Wetzikon / CH | 02 /
MATTHEY, Gaëtan 8498 Gibswil / CH | 03 /
GRAF, Christoph 8608 Bubikon / CH | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21770031.9 | 07.09.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021EP74580 | Priority number, date | CH20200001362 | 22.10.2020 Original published format: CH 13622020 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022083933 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4232729 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/04 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
F16K31/041 (EP);
F16K31/04 (US);
F24F2013/1433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | HEIZUNGS-, LÜFTUNGS- UND KLIMAANLAGENAKTUATOR | [2023/35] | English: | HEATING, VENTILATING AND AIR CONDITIONING ACTUATOR | [2023/35] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DE CHAUFFAGE, DE VENTILATION ET DE CLIMATISATION | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 08.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US9157645 (GOSS STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-9,14-16 * column 2, line 58 - column 11, line 20 * [I] 2,4,10-13; | [XI]US2017115669 (CARETTE JEAN-CHRISTOPHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-9,15,16 * the whole document * [I] 10-14; | [XI]CN208503526U (ROSEWELL FLUID CONTROL GUANGZHOU CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9,15 * abstract * [I] 2,6-8,10-14,16; | [XI]US2019107307 (KRING JACOB [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,9,11,15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0069]; figure - * [I] 2,4,8,10,12,13; | [XI]US2019154298 (ZELCZER AL [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,15,16 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0082]; figure - * [I] 2,10-14; | [A] - Birk Engineering Thermal Solutions, "Thermal Systems for Battery Heating", (20120607), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://www.birkmfg.com/wp-content/uploads/2018/12/Birk_Thermal_Systems_for_Battery_Heating.pdf, (20210210), XP055774750 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * |