EP4122329 - COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF AS AN EGG SUBSTITUTE IN BAKING AND CONFECTIONERY PRODUCTS, KIT AND FOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mantiqueira Alimentos Ltda. Estrada do Jardim, s/nº., Km 06, Jardim 37464-000 Itanhandu / BR | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINTO, Amanda Av. das Américas 3434, bloco 2 - 503, BARRA DA TIJUCA 22640-102 Rio de Janeiro / BR | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Modet y Cía., S.L. C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | Clarke Modet & Co. C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 21770417.0 | 03.02.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021BR50048 | Priority number, date | BR20201005530 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: BR102020005530 | [2023/04] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021184093 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | PT | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122329 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23L15/00, A21D13/06, A23J3/14, A23L25/00, A21D13/066, A21D13/04 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A23L25/30 (EP);
A23L15/35 (EP,BR,US);
A21D13/04 (EP);
A21D13/066 (EP,US);
A21D13/44 (US);
A21D13/80 (US);
A21D2/02 (US);
A21D2/186 (US);
A21D2/266 (US);
A21D2/36 (US);
A23J3/14 (EP,BR);
A23L29/212 (US);
A23L33/185 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | A23L15/00, A21D13/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON ALS EIERSATZ BEI BACK- UND SÜSSWAREN, KIT UND LEBENSMITTELPRODUKT | [2023/04] | English: | COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF AS AN EGG SUBSTITUTE IN BAKING AND CONFECTIONERY PRODUCTS, KIT AND FOOD PRODUCT | [2023/04] | French: | COMPOSITION ET SON UTILISATION COMME SUBSTITUT D'OEUFS DANS DES PRODUITS DE PANIFICATION ET DE CONFISERIE, KIT ET PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | Translation filed | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 18.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 11.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.2023 | 29.02.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017042204 (TETRICK JOSHUA [US], et al); | International search | [A]WO2013067453 (BEYOND EGGS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2014106053 (RUDIE NOEL [US], et al); | [A]WO2014107687 (GLANBIA NUTRITIONALS IRELAND LTD [IE], et al); | [A]WO2017014806 (EARTH ISLAND [US]); | [A]WO2018065941 (SHANDONG JIANYUAN BIOENGINEERING CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2019220431 (ZERO EGG LTD [IL]); | [A]CN110881501 (UNIV CHINA AGRICULTURAL); | by applicant | WO2013067453 | WO2014107687 | WO2019220431 |