EP4113934 - MAP DATA COLLECTION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jianqin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21770626.6 | 17.03.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021CN81335 | Priority number, date | CN202010203284 | 20.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010203284 | [2023/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185285 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113934 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/44, H04L67/10 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04L1/0023 (CN,KR);
G01C21/3893 (US);
G01C21/3815 (EP);
G01C21/3841 (EP,US);
G08G1/0112 (EP);
G08G1/0969 (CN,KR);
H04L1/0015 (CN,KR);
H04L1/0036 (CN);
H04L67/5651 (EP);
H04W4/44 (EP);
H04W4/46 (KR);
G08G1/0141 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | KARTENDATENSAMMELVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2023/01] | English: | MAP DATA COLLECTION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, ET SYSTÈME DE COLLECTE DE DONNÉES CARTOGRAPHIQUES | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2022 | Translation filed | 26.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 02.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019051153 (GIURGIU GAVRIL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0112] *; | [A]WO2019052533 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]US2019325737 (MOUSTAFA HASSNAA [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0042] *; | [Y]US2019392635 (MA TENG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] *; | EP3674920 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0144] ** paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0169] * | International search | [Y]CN105100215 (BEIJING QIHOO TECHNOLOGY CO, et al) [Y] 1-24 * description, paragraphs 0002-0003, 0044-0269 *; | [A]US2018012370 (AGHAMOHAMMADI ALIAKBAR [US], et al) [A] 1-24* entire document *; | [Y]CN109510851 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-24 * description, paragraphs 0135-0284 *; | [Y]CN109862084 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC) [Y] 1-24 * description, paragraphs 0069-0182 * |