EP4120908 - METHODS, DATABASE AND SYSTEM FOR USE WITH VIRAL INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Respiration Scan Ltd 3 Golda Meir Street Weizmann Science Park 7403648 Ness Ziona / IL | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPIDOT, Yaron 13 HaSeorim St. 3780800 Givat Ada / IL | 02 /
BAR ILAN, Igal Moshe 212 Korazim 1293300 Hevel Korazim / IL | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21771108.4 | 18.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021IL50297 | Priority number, date | US202062991664P | 19.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062991664 P | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021186444 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120908 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/497, G16H50/20, G16H50/80, // A61B5/08, A61B5/097, G16H10/40 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/497 (EP,IL,US);
A61B5/082 (EP,IL);
A61B5/097 (EP,IL);
G01N33/4975 (EP,IL,US);
G16H10/40 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | A61B5/08, A61K39/145, A61K39/215, C12Q1/04, G01N33/497 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, DATENBANK UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT VIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2023/04] | English: | METHODS, DATABASE AND SYSTEM FOR USE WITH VIRAL INFECTION | [2023/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, BASE DE DONNÉES ET SYSTÈME DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS AVEC UNE INFECTION VIRALE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE29902593U (GENZYME VIROTECH GMBH [DE]); | [XY]WO2004081527 (SIONEX CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2017045495 (TROWELL STEPHEN [AU], et al); | [A]EP3472613 (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL]) |