EP4120922 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR TREATING A FISTULA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LING, Vincent 19 Forsythia Drive Walpole, Massachusetts 02081 / US | 02 /
IMAICHI, Sachiko 131 Sewall Avenue, Apt. 61 Brookline, Massachusetts 02446 / US | 03 /
PHANEUF, Matthew 29 Oak Ridge Lane Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US | 04 /
LONG, Nathaniel 17 Priest Street Hudson, Massachusetts 01749 / US | 05 /
KASSAB, Rayan 267 Winthrop Street Taunton, Massachusetts 02780 / US | 06 /
LEFFLER, Daniel 15 Clinton Pl. Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21771255.3 | 18.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021US23022 | Priority number, date | US202062991384P | 18.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062991384 P | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021188827 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120922 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/08, A61B17/12, A61B17/50, A61F2/02, A61F2/06, A61M27/00, A61L31/06, A61L31/16 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP);
A61L31/16 (EP);
A61B2017/00526 (EP);
A61B2017/00641 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00893 (EP);
A61L2300/402 (EP);
A61L2300/406 (EP);
A61L2300/41 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L31/06, C08L67/02 (EP);
A61L31/06, C08L75/04 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/04] | A61B17/00, A61B17/08, A61B17/12, A61B17/50, A61F2/02, A61F2/06, A61M27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER FISTEL | [2023/04] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR TREATING A FISTULA | [2023/04] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE FISTULE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 21.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008027531 (RENEKER DARRELL H [US], et al); | [Y]US2015257763 (BLUM KEVIN [US], et al); | [XY]US9456815 (ARMSTRONG DAVID N [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2003130169 (HERGENROTHER PAUL J [US], et al) [Y] 85 * entire document *; | [Y]US2004110841 (KITE PETER [GB], et al) [Y] 78 * entire document *; | [A]US2008208357 (MELANSON DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 40-50, 75-91 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012256355 (KIM YONG MIN [KR], et al) [Y] 44,48,50,76,77 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014030315 (JOHNSON JED K [US]) [Y] 76, 77 * entire document *; | [A]US2014081386 (HASELBY KENNETH A [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 40-50, 75-91 * entire document *; | [XY]US2015257763 (BLUM KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 40, 42, 43, 46, 47, 49 * entire document * [Y] 41, 44, 45, 48, 50, 75-91; | [A]US2016000416 (CARRISON HAROLD F [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 40-50, 75-91 * entire document *; | [A]US2016270897 (WHITING ERIC H [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 40-50, 75-91 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017245847 (OBERMILLER F JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 41, 45, 75-91 * entire document *; | [A] - SALEHI et al., "Spider Silk for Tissue Engineering Applications", Molecules, (20200208), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.3390/molecules25030737, pages 1 - 20, XP055764275 [A] 1-5,40-50, 75-91 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules25030737 | [A] - Tucker Bernabe S, Baker Paul, Vohra Yogesh K, "Surface Modification of Electrospun Polymer Tubular Conduits using Low Temperature Reduced Pressure Plasma", Society for Biomaterials, 2018 Annual Meeting and Exposition, Unpublished, doi:10.13140/rg.2.2.15202.63683, (20180411), Society for Biomaterials, 2018 Annual Meeting and Exposition, URL: http://abstracts.biomaterials.org/data/papers/2018/abstracts/966.pdf, (20211110), XP055859732 [A] 1-5, 40-50, 75-91 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.13140/rg.2.2.15202.63683 |