EP4123304 - NANOWELL DIAGNOSTIC KIT FOR DIAGNOSING CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE SUBSTANCES IN BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mara Nanotech Korea, Inc. 312-ho, 99, Daehak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34134 / KR | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hea Yeon 601-ho, 12, Suyeong-ro 540beon-gil Suyeong-gu Busan 48300 / KR | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21771308.0 | 19.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021KR03444 | Priority number, date | US202062992167P | 20.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062992167 P | KR20200040475 | 02.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200040475 | [2023/04] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187951 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123304 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N27/327, B01L3/00, B82Y5/00, B82Y15/00 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/5438 (EP);
G01N33/54373 (KR);
G01N27/327 (US);
B01L3/5085 (KR);
B01L3/5088 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
G01N27/3276 (KR);
G01N27/3277 (KR);
G01N27/3278 (KR);
B01L2300/0636 (EP);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,KR);
B01L2300/0896 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | G01N33/543, G01N27/327, B01L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | NANOWELL-DIAGNOSEKIT ZUR DIAGNOSE VON SUBSTANZEN MIT KARDIOVASKULÄREN ERKRANKUNGEN IM BLUT | [2023/04] | English: | NANOWELL DIAGNOSTIC KIT FOR DIAGNOSING CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE SUBSTANCES IN BLOOD | [2023/04] | French: | KIT DE DIAGNOSTIC DE NANOPUITS POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER DES SUBSTANCES DE MALADIE CARDIOVASCULAIRE DANS LE SANG | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2022 | Translation filed | 17.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013153443 (NAM HAKHYUN [KR], et al) [Y] 4 * claims 14,21,24,25 *; | [Y]KR20190013474 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0030] , [ 0031] *; | [XI]WO2019183504 (MARA NANOTECH KOREA INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 11, paragraph 3; figures 1,2,7 * * page 13, paragraph 4 * * page 27, paragraph 3 * * page 27, line 20 - line 21 * [I] 8-10; | [XYI]WO2019203493 (KOREA RES INST CHEMICAL TECH [KR]) [X] 1,3,7 * paragraphs [0084] , [ 102] , [ 103]; figures 1,3, 7, 8, 9; claim 8 * [Y] 2,4 [I] 9,10; | [XYI] - Jukyung Lee, "Hypersensitive Electrochemical Biosensors based on Nanowell Array Structures for Point of Care Technology", Dissertation, (20160801), pages 1 - 147, URL: https://repository.library.northeastern.edu/files/neu:cj82pq09v/fulltext.pdf, (20191113), XP055642249 [X] 1,2,7 * page 67, paragraph 1; figures 1.4, 2.4, 7.1,; table 1.3 * * page 45, paragraph 1 * * page 53, paragraph 1 * * page 110, paragraph 2 * * page 111, paragraph 1 * * page 137, paragraph 1 * * page 42, paragraph 2 * * page 57, paragraph 1 * [Y] 6 [I] 5 | [Y] - Gonzalez-Quesada Carlos ET AL, "Monocyte Chemoattractant Protein (MCP-1)/CCL2 as a biomarker in Acute Coronary Syndromes", Current atherosclerosis reports, (20090301), pages 131 - 138, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2787514/pdf/nihms-159097.pdf, (20240129), XP093124839 [Y] 2 * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - JESÚS CONTRERAS-NARANJO ET AL, "Suppressing Non-Specific Binding of Proteins onto Electrode Surfaces in the Development of Electrochemical Immunosensors", BIOSENSORS, (20190118), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.3390/bios9010015, page 15, XP055751216 [Y] 6 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/bios9010015 | International search | [A]JP2005164388 (OSAKA IND PROMOTION ORG) [A] 1-10* See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20150093544 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1-5, 8 and 12, and paragraphs [0021] and [0024]. *; | [A]KR20150118894 (PUSAN NAT UNIV IND COOP FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20190111611 (MARA NANOTECH KOREA INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20190121247 (KOREA RES INST CHEMICAL TECH [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1 and 7-8, and paragraphs [0001], [0003], [0021], [0032]-[0033], [0051], [0068]-[0070] and [0075]-[0077]. * |