EP4124001 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xuerong No. 168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21771442.7 | 02.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021CN78608 | Priority number, date | CN202010199521 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010199521 | [2023/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185069 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124001 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04N23/53, H04N23/57, H04N23/66, G06F1/16 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H04N23/57 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/0264 (EP,CN,US);
G06F1/1686 (EP);
H04M1/0256 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/531 (EP,US);
H04N23/66 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | H04M1/02, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/04] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2022 | Translation filed | 12.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 27.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009002487 (POULIN MARTIN [US]) [A] 12-14 * figure 2 ** paragraph [0032] *; | [Y]US2016080614 (HOLLINGER STEVEN J [US]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0056] *; | [Y]US2017048380 (ITO RYOGO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 3, 8, 10 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0129] *; | [A]US2018157151 (LEE WEN-PIN [TW], et al) [A] 9-11 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * | International search | [A]US7957765 (CAUSEY MARK EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-16* entire document *; | [Y]CN106254744 (CHENGDU CHUANGHUI KEDA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0027] *; | [A]CN206042147U (SHISHI KEDA ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [A]CN109803070 (MKD TECH INC) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [Y]CN209299304U (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * description, paragraphs [0053]-[0078], and figures 1-18 *; | [PX]CN111405093 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-16 * claims 1-16, description, paragraphs [0001]-[0052], figures 1-8 * |