EP4109334 - CHARACTER SELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS EMPLOYING CHARACTER RECOGNITION, AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TENG, Yihua Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HONG, Fangyu Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Xiaohui Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 21771659.6 | 05.03.2021 | [2022/52] | WO2021CN79294 | Priority number, date | CN202010192726 | 18.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010192726 | [2022/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021185098 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109334 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V30/148, G06V10/82 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
G06V30/18076 (EP);
G06F18/241 (CN);
G06V10/26 (US);
G06N3/0442 (EP);
G06N3/0455 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06T11/001 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V10/17 (EP);
G06V10/24 (US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V30/1456 (US);
G06V30/15 (US);
G06V30/153 (EP);
G06V30/19173 (US);
G06V30/1983 (EP);
G06V30/287 (EP);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06T2207/20084 (US);
G06T2207/30176 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/52] | G06K9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | ZEICHENAUSWAHLVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG MIT ZEICHENERKENNUNG UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/52] | English: | CHARACTER SELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS EMPLOYING CHARACTER RECOGNITION, AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SÉLECTION DE CARACTÈRES EMPLOYANT UNE RECONNAISSANCE DE CARACTÈRES, ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2022/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2022 | Translation filed | 22.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - QI XIANBIAO ET AL, "A Novel Joint Character Categorization and Localization Approach for Character-Level Scene Text Recognition", 2019 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION WORKSHOPS (ICDARW), IEEE, (20190922), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ICDARW.2019.40086, pages 83 - 90, XP033649139 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDARW.2019.40086 | International search | [A]US2016259971 (KIM CHELHWON [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [X]CN106469310 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [X] 12, 16-17 * description paragraphs 25-35, 37-45, 117 *; | [A]CN106778728 (NUBIA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]US2018121744 (KIM PYONG KUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-17* entire document *; | [A]CN108182437 (BEIJING JINDI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * entire document *; | [A]CN109902622 (CHONGQING INST GREEN & INTELLIGENT TECH CAS) [A] 1-17 * description, paragraphs 36-50 * |