EP4124066 - LAYERED PIEZOELECTRIC ELEMENT AND ELECTROACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHIKAWA Teruo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 210, Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 02 /
HIRAGUCHI Kazuo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 210, Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 03 /
KAGAWA Yusuke c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 210, Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 04 /
MIYOSHI Tetsu c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 210, Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21771776.8 | 02.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021JP07901 | Priority number, date | JP20200049274 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020049274 | JP20200212292 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020212292 | [2023/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187086 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124066 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10N30/50, H10N30/87, H04R17/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H10N30/50 (EP,KR,US);
H10N30/87 (KR);
H04R17/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04R7/04 (KR);
H10N30/20 (KR);
H10N30/872 (EP,US);
H10N30/875 (EP);
H10N30/88 (KR);
H10N30/883 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | H04R7/04, H04R17/00, H01L41/047, H01L41/053, H01L41/083, H01L41/09, H01L41/18, H01L41/193, H01L41/253 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | GESCHICHTETES PIEZOELEKTRISCHES ELEMENT UND ELEKTROAKUSTISCHER WANDLER | [2023/04] | English: | LAYERED PIEZOELECTRIC ELEMENT AND ELECTROACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER | [2023/04] | French: | ÉLÉMENT PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE STRATIFIÉ ET TRANSDUCTEUR ÉLECTROACOUSTIQUE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2022 | Translation filed | 13.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009094259 (DENSO CORP); | [A]US2016014527 (MIYOSHI TETSU [JP], et al); | [A]US2017173634 (HASHIMOTO JUNICHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2019078053 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [YA]JP2010177867 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JP2014209724 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [YA]WO2016039138 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]); | [Y]WO2017018313 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]); | [YA]WO2019078053 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2014209724 |