EP4121960 - RENDERING ENCODED 6DOF AUDIO BITSTREAM AND LATE UPDATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATE, Sujeet Shyamsundar Nosturinraitti 2 A 1 33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
ERONEN, Antti Hylliniitynkatu 13 AS 1 33820 Tampere / FI | 03 /
LEPPÄNEN, Jussi Mielikinkatu 26 33580 Tampere / FI | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21771926.9 | 09.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021FI50169 | Priority number, date | US202062990022P | 16.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062990022 P | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021186104 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121960 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008, H04S7/00, G06F3/01, G10L19/16, G06F3/16, H04N21/233 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H04S7/304 (EP);
H04S7/302 (US);
G06F3/165 (EP);
G10L19/167 (EP);
H04N21/439 (EP);
H04N21/4394 (EP);
H04N21/4728 (EP);
H04N21/8106 (EP);
H04N21/4318 (EP);
H04S2400/11 (EP,US);
H04S2400/15 (EP);
H04S7/303 (EP);
H04S7/306 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | WIEDERGABE VON CODIERTEN 6DOF-AUDIO-BITSTROM UND SPÄTEN AKTUALISIERUNGEN | [2023/04] | English: | RENDERING ENCODED 6DOF AUDIO BITSTREAM AND LATE UPDATES | [2023/04] | French: | RENDU DE FLUX BINAIRE AUDIO 6DOF CODÉ ET MISES À JOUR TARDIVES | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015065248 (LATENDRESSE JOSHUA [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2011040396 (KRAEMER ALAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * pars. [0052], [0055], [0065]; claim 1 *; | [X]US2019139562 (FUEG SIMONE [DE], et al) [X] 1-3, 11-12,19-21 * abstract; pars. [0024], [0074]-[0079], [0130], [0159]; Tables 1-2; figs. 8-9, 12; claims 1, 13 *; | [X]WO2019197349 (DOLBY INT AB [NL]) [X] 1-21 * abstract; p. 10 II. 23-28, p. 10 I. 23 - p. 11 I. 7, p. 11, II. 8-13 and II. 21- 28, p. 12 II. 8-12 and II. 25-30, p. 13 I. 15 and II. 23-29, p. 14 II. 1-10 and II. 21-25, p. 14 I. 17 - p. 15 I. 2, p. 16 I. 25 - p. 17 I. 21, p. 18 II. 18-19, p. 31 II. 17-18; fig. 5, 8, claims 1-2, 4 *; | [A] - "MPEG-I 6DoF Audio Encoder Input Format", 129. MPEG meeting; 20200113 - 20200117; Brussels; (Motion Picture Expert Group or ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11), (20200117), XP030224402 [A] 1-21 * , sections 1, 2, 3.1-3.2; fig. 2 * | [A] - "MPEG-I Audio Architecture and Requirements", 125. MPEG meeting; 20190114 - 20190118; Marrakech; (Motion Picture Expert Group or ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11), (20190118), XP030212699 [A] 1-21 * , section 3.5; fig. 1 * |