EP4122703 - BONDED BODY OF METAL AND RESIN, AND METHOD FOR BONDING METAL AND RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2023/20] |
Former [2023/04] | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba daimon 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTANI, Kazuo c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Nobuyuki c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21772134.9 | 09.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021JP09122 | Priority number, date | JP20200048378 | 18.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020048378 | [2023/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187214 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4122703 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, C09J5/04, C09J175/02, C09J201/02 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C09J5/02 (EP);
B32B15/082 (US);
B32B15/085 (EP);
B32B15/088 (EP);
B32B15/09 (EP);
B32B15/18 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/281 (EP);
B32B27/285 (EP);
B32B27/286 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP);
B32B38/162 (US);
C08G18/3876 (EP);
C08G18/8116 (EP);
C08J5/12 (EP);
C09J175/02 (EP);
C09J175/14 (EP);
C09J175/16 (EP);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2333/12 (US);
C08J2400/00 (EP);
C09J2400/163 (EP);
C09J2400/166 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | VERBUNDENER KÖRPER AUS METALL UND HARZ SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON METALL UND HARZ | [2023/04] | English: | BONDED BODY OF METAL AND RESIN, AND METHOD FOR BONDING METAL AND RESIN | [2023/04] | French: | CORPS LIÉ DE MÉTAL ET DE RÉSINE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE LIAISON DE MÉTAL ET DE RÉSINE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2022 | Translation filed | 07.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 17.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2007161912 (UNIV KAGAWA) [X] 1-2, 5-11, 19-22 * claims, paragraphs [0018], [0020]-[0033], fig. 1-3 * [Y] 19; | [XY]JP2008291063 (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-2, 5-11, 2-22 * claims, paragraphs [0046]-[0051], [0054], [0070]-[0071] * [Y] 19; | [X]JP2009197048 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1, 3, 5-7, 17,20-22 * claims, paragraphs [0019]-[0022], [0041] *; | [A]JP2011091066 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-22 * claims, paragraph [0023], fig. 1 *; | [X]JP2012121151 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-2, 5-6 * claims, paragraphs [0016]-[0019], [0023] *; | [XY]JP2013105803 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-2, 5-11, 20-22 * claims, paragraphs [0015]-[0016], [0018]-[0019], [0021]-[0024], [0027], [0030], fig. 1, 2 * [Y] 19; | [XY]JP2018039211 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-2, 5-9, 11,20-22 * claims, paragraphs [0011]-[0015], [0019]-[0024], [0030] * [Y] 19; | [XY]JP2018052067 (ASAHI FR R&D CO LTD) [X] 1, 5-7, 9-11, 2-22 * claims, paragraphs [0010], [0031]-[0036], [0044]-[0045], examples 6-8 * [Y] 19; | [A]WO2019026382 (ADVANCED TECH INC [JP]) [A] 1-22* claims, paragraphs [0098]-[0100], [0197], fig. 1(b), 17(b) * | by applicant | JP6268370B |