EP4121210 - SEAL COMPONENT FOR A RAPID DIAGNOSTIC TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Detect, Inc. 530 Old Whitfield Street Guilford, CT 06437 / US | [2023/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTHBERG, Jonathan, M. 215 Uncas Point Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 02 /
ROSENBLUTH, Benjamin 49 Deepwood Drive Hamden, CT 06517 / US | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21772199.2 | 16.03.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021US22594 | Priority number, date | US202062991039P | 17.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062991039 P | US202063002209P | 30.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063002209 P | US202063010626P | 15.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063010626 P | US202063010578P | 15.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063010578 P | US202063013450P | 21.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063013450 P | US202063022533P | 10.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022533 P | US202063022534P | 10.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022534 P | US202063027890P | 20.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027890 P | US202063027859P | 20.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027859 P | US202063027886P | 20.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027886 P | US202063027874P | 20.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027874 P | US202063027878P | 20.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027878 P | US202063027864P | 20.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027864 P | US202063034901P | 04.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063034901 P | US202063036887P | 09.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063036887 P | US202063053534P | 17.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063053534 P | US202063059928P | 31.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063059928 P | US202063061072P | 04.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063061072 P | US202063065131P | 13.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063065131 P | US202063068303P | 20.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063068303 P | US202063081201P | 21.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063081201 P | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021188562 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4121210 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, A61M31/00, C12Q1/686, A61B5/00, A61B7/02, A61B8/06, // A61B10/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B01L3/5029 (EP);
B01L3/502738 (US);
B01L3/5023 (EP);
B01L3/502707 (US);
G01N33/54388 (US);
A61B10/0045 (EP);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
B01L2300/049 (US);
B01L2300/0672 (EP);
B01L2300/0825 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0867 (EP);
B01L2400/0478 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | B01L3/00, A61M31/00, C12Q1/686, A61B5/00, A61B7/02, A61B8/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINEN SCHNELLEN DIAGNOSTISCHEN TEST | [2023/04] | English: | SEAL COMPONENT FOR A RAPID DIAGNOSTIC TEST | [2023/04] | French: | COMPOSANT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ POUR UN ESSAI DE DIAGNOSTIC RAPIDE | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/38] | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002085958 (NEMCEK THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [ 0096]; figures 11A-D, 9A-F, 10; claims 1, 12, 13 *; | [XA]US6890484 (BAUTISTA LORRAINE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11-15 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 13; figures 1, 2, 4; claim 1 * * column 11, line 22 - column 11, line 25 * * column 19, line 37 - column 19, line 55 * [A] 4-7,9,10; | [A]US2005177057 (FRIEDMAN MITCHELL [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0035] , [ 0036] , [ 0044] , [ 0045]; figures 3, 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US2015367343 (ETTLIN JOSEF [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0052] , [ 0053] , [ 0054] , [ 0056] , [ 0059] , [ 0062]; figures 1, 2; claim 1 *; | [XA]CN205570357U (EMERTHER COMPANY (SHANGHAI)) [X] 1,2,4-11,14 * paragraphs [0021] , [ 0025] , [ 0103]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0191] * [A] 3,12,13,15; | [A]US2018217139 (GUIRGUIS RAOUF A [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0073] , [ 0075] , [ 0076] , [ 0094]; figures 1, 5, 6, 7; claims 1, 9 *; | [XA]US2018229231 (KHATTAK AYUB [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14 * paragraphs [0192] , [ 0194] , [ 0195] , [ 0196]; figure 5 * [A] 12,13,15; | [XA]US2018339292 (KATZ EMIL [IL], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8,9,11-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011]; figures 2, 3, 8A, 8B, 8C, 10A, 10B * * paragraphs [0044] , [ 0046] , [ 0048] , [ 0049] , [ 0052] * [A] 2,3,7,10 | International search | [A]US2005177057 (FRIEDMAN MITCHELL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US8415141 (YOU QIMIN [CN], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2015353880 (CLARK DOUGLAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [X]CN205570357U (EMERTHER COMPANY (SHANGHAI)) [X] 1-20 * machine translation * |