EP4017196 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING PRIORITY OF HARQ FEEDBACK IN NR V2X [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Daesung IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seungmin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
SEO, Hanbyul IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21772335.2 | 18.02.2021 | [2022/25] | WO2021KR02059 | Priority number, date | US202062991551P | 18.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062991551 P | KR20200037816 | 27.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200037816 | KR20200056536 | 12.05.2020 Original published format: KR 20200056536 | US202063104497P | 22.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063104497 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021187759 | Date: | 23.09.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017196 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L5/00, H04L1/18, H04W72/14, H04W72/04, H04W92/18 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/0018 (KR);
H04L1/1848 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W4/40 (EP,KR);
H04W72/0446 (CN);
H04W72/20 (KR);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/56 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H04W72/12, H04L5/00, H04L1/18, H04W72/14, H04W92/18, H04W4/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER PRIORITÄT EINER HARQ-RÜCKKOPPLUNG IN NR V2X | [2022/25] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING PRIORITY OF HARQ FEEDBACK IN NR V2X | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER LA PRIORITÉ D'UNE RÉTROACTION HARQ DANS NR V2X | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2022 | Translation filed | 15.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 21.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP4027732 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | International search | [A]US2019174533 (LEE YOUNGDAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0115]-[0128]; and figure 7. *; | [A] - Ericsson, "Text proposal for TS 38.213 endorsed in [100e-NR-5G_V2X_NRSL- RA_Mode1-03]", 3GPP Draft; R1-2001414, (20200306), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 2, XP051860460 [A] 1-20 * See section 16.5. * | [A] - Ericsson, "Feature lead summary#4 on Resource allocation for NR sidelink Mode 1", 3GPP Draft; R1-2001367, (20200306), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 44, XP051860420 [A] 1-20 * See section 1. * | [A] - RAN WG1, "Remaining issues on Mode 1 resource allocation in NR V2X", (20200215), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 44, XP051853345 [A] 1-20 * See section 2. * | [A] - OPPO, "Remaining issues of mode 1 resource allocation for NR-V2X", 3GPP Draft; R1-2000490, (20200215), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 9, XP051853329 [A] 1-20 * See section 2. * |