EP4208909 - TEMPERATURE CONTROL METHOD FOR A BATTERY STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESTAS WIND SYSTEMS A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGHUCHANDRA, Karthikeya Balladi 8200 Aarhus N / DK | 02 /
REZKALLA, Michel Maher Naguib 8200 Aarhus N / DK | 03 /
SANCAR, Ugur 8200 Aarhus N / DK | 04 /
CHRISTENSEN, Lars Chr. 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21772674.4 | 06.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021DK50274 | Priority number, date | DK2020PA70572 | 04.09.2020 Original published format: DK PA202070572 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022048724 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208909 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/617, H01M10/627, H01M10/6563, H01M10/6571, H01M10/663 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H01M10/617 (EP);
H01M10/486 (EP);
H01M10/627 (EP);
H01M10/63 (EP);
H01M10/6563 (EP);
H01M10/6571 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURREGELVERFAHREN FÜR EIN BATTERIESPEICHERSYSTEM | [2023/28] | English: | TEMPERATURE CONTROL METHOD FOR A BATTERY STORAGE SYSTEM | [2023/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE TEMPÉRATURE POUR SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE DE BATTERIE | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2017069939 (FRUTSCHY KRISTOPHER JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0058] - [0064]; figures 16-18 * [A] 6-8,10; | [A]CN107181019 (CHONGQING CHANGAN AUTOMOBILE CO LTD , et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018168276 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US2017365893 |