EP4204333 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PICKING PRODUCTS IN A PICKING STATION OF AN AUTOMATIC STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOSTORE TECHNOLOGY AS Stokkastrandvegen 85 5578 Nedre Vats / NO | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAGERLAND, Ingvar 5541 KOLNES / NO | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 21772745.2 | 31.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021EP73981 | Priority number, date | NO20200000943 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: NO 20200943 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022043573 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4204333 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137, // B65G1/04, G06Q10/087 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B65G1/1378 (EP,US);
B65G1/137 (NO);
G06Q10/047 (NO,US);
B65G1/1373 (NO);
B65G47/90 (NO,US);
G06Q10/08 (NO);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
B65G1/0464 (EP);
B65G2209/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/27] | B65G1/137, G06Q10/08, B65G1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM KOMMISSIONIEREN VON PRODUKTEN IN EINER KOMMISSIONIERSTATION EINES AUTOMATISCHEN REGALBEDIENUNGSSYSTEMS | [2023/27] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PICKING PRODUCTS IN A PICKING STATION OF AN AUTOMATIC STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRÉLÈVEMENT DE PRODUITS DANS UN POSTE DE PRÉLÈVEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME AUTOMATIQUE DE STOCKAGE ET D'EXTRACTION | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 14.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3166876 (DEMATIC CORP [US]); | [A]US9751693 (BATTLES JON STUART [US], et al); | [A]US2018218469 (LERT JR JOHN G [US], et al); | [A]US2019129371 (WAGNER THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]WO2019223593 (CAINIAO SMART LOGISTICS HOLDING LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2019232613 (ATTABOTICS [CA]); | [A]WO2019238641 (AUTOSTORE TECH AS [NO]) | International search | [A]EP3166876 (DEMATIC CORP [US]); | [A]US9751693 (BATTLES JON STUART [US], et al); | [A]US2018218469 (LERT JR JOHN G [US], et al); | [A]US2019129371 (WAGNER THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]WO2019223593 (CAINIAO SMART LOGISTICS HOLDING LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2019232613 (ATTABOTICS [CA]); | [A]WO2019238641 (AUTOSTORE TECH AS [NO]) | by applicant | WO2014090684 | WO2015193278 | US2018218469 |