EP4204409 - PESTICIDALLY ACTIVE HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES WITH SULFUR CONTAINING SUBSTITUENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Crop Protection AG Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIKERVAR, Vikas Bracknell, Berkshire, RG42 6EY / GB | 02 /
SASMAL, Swarnendu Corlim Ilhas Goa 403 110 / IN | 03 /
MUEHLEBACH, Michel 4332 Stein / CH | 04 /
STOLLER, André 4332 Stein / CH | 05 /
EMERY, Daniel 4332 Stein / CH | 06 /
JEANGUENAT, André 4332 Stein / CH | 07 /
BUCHHOLZ, Anke 4332 Stein / CH | 08 /
KURTZ, Benedikt 4332 Stein / CH | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21772750.2 | 31.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021EP73993 | Priority number, date | IN202011037485 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: IN202011037485 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022043576 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4204409 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A01N43/90 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP);
C07D403/14 (KR,US);
A01N43/54 (KR);
A01N43/56 (KR,US);
A01N43/90 (KR);
A01P7/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | PESTIZIDWIRKSAME HETEROCYCLISCHE DERIVATE MIT SCHWEFELHALTIGEN SUBSTITUENTEN | [2023/27] | English: | PESTICIDALLY ACTIVE HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES WITH SULFUR CONTAINING SUBSTITUENTS | [2023/27] | French: | DÉRIVÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES À ACTION PESTICIDE COMPORTANT DES SUBSTITUANTS CONTENANT DU SOUFRE | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 31.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2012031004 (GILEAD CONNECTICUT INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-17* page 1, line 11 - page 1, line 15 *; | [IDA]WO2018130443 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [ID] 18 * page 88, 2nd compound on page; page 28, compounds (VI) * [A] 1-17; | [IDA]WO2018130437 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [ID] 18 * page 13, compuonds VI; page 72, intermediate in reaction; page 75, 2nd compound on page * [A] 1-17; | [AD]WO2019131575 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AD] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006]; example -; claim - *; | [IDA]WO2020002082 (BAYER AG [DE]) [ID] 18 * page 17, process A, compounds VI; page 21, process B, compounds IX; page 70, intermediate in reaction; page 1, line 2 - page 1, line 4; example -; claim - * [A] 1-17; | [A] - DI MAURO GIOVANNI ET AL, "Mechanistic Pathways in Amide Activation: Flexible Synthesis of Oxazoles and Imidazoles", ORGANIC LETTERS, US, (20170721), vol. 19, no. 14, doi:10.1021/acs.orglett.7b01678, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 3815 - 3818, XP055859928 [A] 1-17 * compounds 3j, 3r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.orglett.7b01678 | by applicant | EP0353191 | EP0367474 | EP0374753 | EP0392225 | WO9013651 | EP0401979 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO9307278 | WO9533818 | WO9534656 | US5631072 | WO0015615 | WO0215701 | WO03000906 | WO03018810 | WO03034823 | WO03052073 | WO2005064072 | WO2005113886 | EP1724392 | WO2006128870 | WO2007090739 | WO2008151984 | WO2009042907 | US2010160303 | WO2011138281 | WO2012031004 | WO2012086848 | WO2013018928 | WO2014006945 | WO2014095675 | WO2015155075 | WO2016020286 | WO2016156085 | WO2016156290 | WO2016202742 | WO2017025510 | WO2017029179 | WO2017055473 | WO2017055469 | WO2017093348 | WO2017118689 | WO2017153380 | WO2017220485 | WO2018065414 | WO2018130437 | WO2018130443 | WO2018153707 | WO2018158365 | WO2018202428 | WO2018228896 | WO2019110427 | WO2019131575 | WO2020002082 | WO2020174094 | - J. Org. Chem., (20030000), vol. 62, page 8240 | - Bull. Chem Soc. Chim. Belg., (19970000), vol. 106, page 151 | - Synthetic Communications, (20110000), vol. 41, pages 67 - 72 | - Tetrahedron, (20050000), vol. 61, no. 46, pages 10827 - 10852 | - Synthesis, (20150000), vol. 47, pages 1280 - 1290 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19630000), vol. 85, no. 3, pages 354 - 355 | - J. Organomet. Chem., (19990000), vol. 576, pages 147 - 168 | - J. Org. Chem., (20060000), vol. 71, pages 3332 - 3334 | - Chem. Commun., (19970000), pages 351 - 352 | - Synthesis, (20080000), pages 3407 - 3410 | - Angew. Chem., (20070000), vol. 46, page 7075 | - Tetrahedron, (20040000), vol. 60, no. 51, pages 11869 - 11874 | - Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20160000), vol. 26, pages 5947 - 5950 | - Synlett, (19920000), no. 6, pages 531 - 533 | - Tetrahedron, (20060000), vol. 62, pages 9589 - 9602 | - Synthesis, (20170000), vol. 49, pages 4007 - 4016 | - Synthesis, (20060000), pages 1757 - 1759 | - IOSR Journal of Applied Chemistry, (20140000), vol. 7, pages 16 - 27 | - Synlett, (20060000), no. 4, pages 591 - 594 | - Synthesis, vol. 1981, no. 1, pages 1 - 28 | - Tetrahedron Letters, (19820000), vol. 23, pages 2475 - 2478 | - Org. Lett., (20050000), vol. 7, pages 4107 - 4110 | - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20060000), vol. 49, no. 12, pages 3614 - 3627 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19720000), vol. 94, no. 17, pages 6203 - 6205 | - Chem. Ber., vol. 1881, no. 14, page 2725 | - CAS, no. 1808115-49-2 | - J.Organomet. Chem., (19990000), vol. 576, pages 147 - 168 | - J. Org. Chem., (20050000), vol. 70, pages 8601 - 8604 | - "J. Org. Chem.", J. Org. Chem., (20090000), vol. 74, pages 5599 - 5602 | - Angew. Chem., (20040000), vol. 43, pages 1132 - 1136 | - J. Med. Chem., (19890000), vol. 32, no. 12, pages 2561 - 73 | - CAS , no. 1255091-74-7 |