EP4208456 - HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENZ, Joerg 4070 Basel / CH | 02 /
GRETHER, Uwe 4070 Basel / CH | 03 /
HORNSPERGER, Benoit 4070 Basel / CH | 04 /
KROLL, Carsten 4070 Basel / CH | 05 /
KUHN, Bernd 4070 Basel / CH | 06 /
MARTIN, Rainer, E. 4070 Basel / CH | 07 /
O'HARA, Fionn 4070 Basel / CH | 08 /
PUELLMANN, Bernd 4070 Basel / CH | 09 /
RICHTER, Hans 4070 Basel / CH | 10 /
RITTER, Martin 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Neuhaus, Christian Michel, et al F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21772763.5 | 01.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021EP74150 | Priority number, date | EP20200194318 | 03.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20194318 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022049134 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208456 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/06, C07D403/14, C07D413/04, C07D413/14, C07D487/04, A61K31/4192, A61K31/422, A61P25/00 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
C07D403/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4025 (KR);
A61K31/407 (KR);
A61K9/2009 (IL,US);
A61K9/2054 (IL,US);
A61K9/2059 (IL,US);
A61K9/485 (IL,US);
A61K9/4858 (IL,US);
A61K9/4866 (IL,US);
A61P1/00 (KR);
A61P25/00 (KR);
A61P25/18 (KR);
A61P25/28 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (KR);
C07D401/06 (KR);
C07D401/14 (IL,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (KR);
C07D403/14 (EP,IL);
C07D413/04 (EP,IL);
C07D413/06 (IL,KR,US);
C07D413/12 (KR);
C07D413/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D417/06 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Validation states | MA | 03.04.2023 | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2023/28] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS | [2023/28] | French: | COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 03.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4632925 (MULLIN JR JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * abstract *; | [A]US4956359 (TAYLOR JR CHANDLER R [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * table 1, examples 11, 17; column 1 *; | [A]WO0107043 (VERNALIS RES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 22, examples 16, 17, 21;; claim - *; | [A]WO2004096763 (VERNALIS RES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2009058347 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 106, example 131;; claim - *; | [A]WO2010106333 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL TECHNOLOGY [GB], et al) [A] 1-27 * examples 257-260; claim - *; | [A] - VENKATESH RAMINENI ET AL, "Novel benzothiazine-piperazine derivatives by peptide-coupling as potential anti-proliferative agents", BIORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM , NL, (20161025), vol. 27, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2016.10.071, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 354 - 359, XP029862571 [A] 1-27 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2016.10.071 | by applicant | WO2007117557 | WO2012155199 | WO2016180536 | - IANNOTTI, F. A. et al., Prog. in Lipid Res., (20160000), vol. 62, page 107 | - CHANDA, P. K. et al., Mol. Pharmacol., (20100000), vol. 78, page 996 | - VIADER, A. et al., Cell. Rep., (20150000), vol. 12, page 798 | - LLEO, A., Cell. Mol. Life Sci., (20070000), vol. 64, page 1403 | - NOMURA, D. K. et al., Science, (20110000), vol. 334, page 809 | - LONG, J. Z. et al., Nat. Chem. Biol., (20090000), vol. 5, page 37 | - IGNATOWSKA-JANKOWSKA, B. et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (20150000), vol. 353, page 424 | - ZHONG, P. et al., Neuropsychopharmacology, (20140000), vol. 39, page 1763 | - BERNAL-CHICO, A. et al., Glia, (20150000), vol. 63, page 163 | - ALPAR, A. et al., Nat. Commun., (20140000), vol. 5, page 4421 | - FELIU, A. et al., J Neurosci., (20170000), vol. 37, page 8385 | - QIN, H. et al., Cell Biochem. Biophys., (20140000), vol. 70, page 33 | - NOMURA, D. K. et al., Cell, (20090000), vol. 140, page 49 | - NOMURA, D. K. et al., Chem. Biol., (20110000), vol. 18, page 846 | - JINLONG, Y. et al., Nat. Commun., (20200000), vol. 11, page 2978 | - MARQUEZ, L. et al., PLoS One, (20090000), vol. 4, page e6893 | - WRIGHT, K. et al., Gastroenterology, (20050000), vol. 129, page 437 | - DUNCAN, M. et al., Aliment. Pharmacol. Ther., (20050000), vol. 22, page 667 | - GRILL, M. et al., Sci. Rep., (20190000), vol. 9, page 2358 | - WANG, J. et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (20200000), vol. 525, page 962 | - G. A. MOLANDER et al., J. Org. Chem., (20140000), vol. 79, pages 5771 - 5780 | - SARTORI, G. et al., Green Chem., (20000000), vol. 2, page 140 | - BARANY, G.MERRIFIELD, R. B., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19770000), vol. 99, page 7363 | - WALDMANN, H. et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed. Engl., (19960000), vol. 35, page 2056 | - A. SUZUKI, J. Organomet. Chem., (19990000), vol. 576, pages 147 - 168 | - MUKAIYAMA T., Angew. Chem., Int. Ed. Engl., (19790000), vol. 18, pages 707 - 808 | - G. SARTORI et al., Green Chemistry, (20000000), vol. 2, pages 140 - 148 | - A. K. GHOSH et al., J. Med. Chem., (20150000), vol. 58, pages 2895 - 2940 | - A. GAVRYUSHIN et al., Org. Lett., (20050000), vol. 7, pages 4871 - 4874 | - A. SUZUKI, Pure Appl. Chem., (19910000), vol. 63, pages 419 - 422 | - A. SUZUKIN. MIYAURA, Chem. Rev., (19950000), vol. 95, pages 2457 - 2483 | - V. FARINA et al., Org. React., (19970000), vol. 50, pages 1 - 652 | - C. CORDOVILLA et al., ACS Catal., (20150000), vol. 5, pages 3040 - 3053 | - D. HAAS et al., ACS Catal., (20160000), vol. 6, pages 1540 - 1552 | - E.-I. NEGISHI, Acc. Chem. Res., (19820000), vol. 15, pages 340 - 348 | - C. K. PRIER et al., Chem. Rev., (20130000), vol. 113, pages 5322 - 5363 | - G. DEQUIREZ et al., ChemistrySelect, (20170000), vol. 2, pages 8841 - 8846 | - BRILL, T. B.LANDON, S. J., Chem. Rev., (19840000), vol. 84, page 577 | - ORELLI, L. R., Curr. Org. Chem., (20150000), vol. 19, page 744 | - MARYANOFF, B. E.REITZ, A. B., Chem. Rev., (19890000), vol. 89, page 863 | - WADSWORTH JR., W. S., Org. React., (19770000), vol. 25, page 73 | - NICOLAOU, K. C.HARTNER, M. W.GUNZNER, J. L.NADIN, A., Liebigs Ann.lRecueil, (19970000), page 1283 | - STEC, W. J., Acc. Chem. Res., (19830000), vol. 16, page 411 | - D. A. WALSH et al., J. Med. Chem., (19890000), vol. 32, pages 105 - 118 | - S. HE et al., J. Med. Chem., (20140000), vol. 57, pages 1543 - 1556 | - T. SENTER et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20150000), vol. 25, pages 2720 - 2725 | - K. S. ASHTON et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20110000), vol. 21, pages 5191 - 5196 | - K. M. HUTCHINGS et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20080000), vol. 18, pages 5087 - 5090 | - X. ZHANGD. W. C. MACMILLAN, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20170000), vol. 139, pages 11353 - 11356 | - F. LIU et al., J. Med. Chem., (20170000), vol. 60, pages 5507 - 5520 | - FLETCHER, S., Org. Chem. Front., (20150000), vol. 2, page 739 | - CAS, no. 2227205-20-9 | - CAS , no. 41864-22-6 | - CAS, no. 1064194-10-0 | - CAS , no. 1125410-02-7 |