EP4208172 - VACCINE COMPRISING AN ANTIGEN AND A TLR2 AGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 30.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISR Immune System Regulation Holding AB (publ) Retzius väg 11 171 65 Solna / SE | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINQVIST, Ola 756 53 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
SJÖDAHL, Johan 171 65 Solna / SE | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Aera A/S Niels Hemmingsens Gade 10, 5th Floor 1153 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21773061.3 | 03.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021EP74399 | Priority number, date | EP20200194425 | 03.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20194425 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022049260 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208172 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7048, A61K39/215, A61K31/07, A61K45/06, A61P31/14 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K31/07 (EP,US);
A61K31/59 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K39/215 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/07, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/59, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFF MIT EINEM ANTIGEN UND EINEM TLR2-AGONISTEN | [2023/28] | English: | VACCINE COMPRISING AN ANTIGEN AND A TLR2 AGONIST | [2023/28] | French: | VACCIN COMPRENANT UN ANTIGÈNE ET UN AGONISTE DE TLR2 | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 14.11.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 29.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2010297165 (BERZOFSKY JAY A [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018153954 (IMMUNE SYSTEM REGULATION HOLDING AB [SE]); | [XY]WO2020023872 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al); | by applicant | US3478014 | US4328334 | US4474768 | WO2005054265 |