EP4221910 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FEEDING AN ELONGATE WORKPIECE TO A FORMING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAFIOS Aktiengesellschaft Silberburgstraße 5 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖNNINGER, Andreas 72661 Grafenberg / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Martin 72119 Ammerbuch / DE | 03 /
KUHNERT, Oliver 72827 Wannweil / DE | 04 /
SINGLE, Tobias 72581 Dettingen / DE | 05 /
SAUTTER, Robin 72793 Pfullingen / DE | 06 /
SCHWELLBACH, Peter 72406 Bisingen / DE | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21773331.0 | 02.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021EP74294 | Priority number, date | DE202010212480 | 02.10.2020 Original published format: DE102020212480 | [2023/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022069145 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4221910 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4221910 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21F1/02, B21F23/00, B21C47/24 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
B21F23/00 (EP);
B21F23/005 (US);
B21C47/24 (EP);
B21C47/245 (EP);
B21F1/02 (EP);
B21F23/002 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN EINES LANGGESTRECKTEN WERKSTÜCKS ZU EINER UMFORMMASCHINE | [2023/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FEEDING AN ELONGATE WORKPIECE TO A FORMING MACHINE | [2023/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACHEMINEMENT D'UNE PIÈCE ALLONGÉE DANS UNE MACHINE DE FORMAGE | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 26.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0446687 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 47; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0537464 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]) [A] 1-16 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1864726 (PIEGATRICI MACCH ELETTR [IT]) [A] 1-16* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP3219654 (KOMAX HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1,6 *; | [AD]DE102018102914 (GROB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE102018102914 |