EP4217139 - SAWBLADE AND HOLE SAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Donghui 4528 Zuchwil, Solothurn / CH | 02 /
GROLIMUND, Daniel 4528 Zuchwil / CH | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 21773713.9 | 06.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021EP74472 | Priority number, date | DE202010211809 | 22.09.2020 Original published format: DE102020211809 | [2023/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063552 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4217139 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/14, B23D61/04, B23B51/04 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B23D61/14 (EP,US);
B23B51/04 (EP);
B23D61/04 (EP,US);
B23D61/127 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | SÄGEBLATT SOWIE LOCHSÄGE | [2023/31] | English: | SAWBLADE AND HOLE SAW | [2023/31] | French: | LAME DE SCIE ET SCIE CLOCHE | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 24.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 22.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2024 | Decision despatched | 22.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3430526 (VALENZIANO FRANK P) [X] 1,2,9,10,12 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 47 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-8 [I] 11; | [XA]EP0266022 (MILFORD PROD CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9-11 * column 5, line 15 - column 10, line 68 * * insbesondere: * * column 8, line 42 - line 56 * * figures 1,4,6 * [A] 3-8,12; | [XAI]JPH0349822 (COSMO GIKEN KK) [X] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document * * insbesondere: * * figures 3,4,6 * [A] 3-8,12 [I] 11; | [A]US5249485 (HAYDEN SR ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 48 - line 68 ** figure 1 *; | [XAI]JPH08309619 (TANI TEC KK) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0009] * * figures 2,3,5 * [A] 3-8,12 [I] 11; | [Y]US2002067963 (HOPPER PETER B [US], et al) [Y] 3-8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0019] , [0042] , [0043] , [0050] * * figures 3,4,10 * | by applicant | EP0054885 | - BROCKHAUS, "Naturwissenschaften und Technik", Band, (19890000), vol. 4 |