EP4217406 - POLYMERISATION OF VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE IN WATER USING MACROMOLECULAR SUSPENDING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Specialty Polymers Italy S.p.A. Via Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABUSLEME, Julio A. 21047 SARONNO (Varese) / IT | 02 /
LE GULLUCHE, Anne-Charlotte 20149 Milano Milano / IT | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Briatore, Andrea Syensqo S.A. Viale Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | Briatore, Andrea Solvay SA Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek 310 1120 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 21773814.5 | 14.09.2021 | [2023/31] | WO2021EP75178 | Priority number, date | EP20200197702 | 23.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20197702 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022063630 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4217406 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/22, C08F114/22, C08F214/22, C08J5/22, C08L27/16, C08F2/20, C08L1/28, C08L29/04 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
C08F114/22 (EP);
C08F14/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/18 (KR);
C08F2/20 (KR);
C08F214/225 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08L27/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2327/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2401/28 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2429/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/22, C08F2/20 (EP);
C08F214/225, C08F220/06 (EP);
C08L27/16, C08L1/284, C08L1/286 (EP);
C08L27/16, C08L1/286, C08L29/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | POLYMERISATION VON VINYLIDENFLUORID IN WASSER UNTER VERWENDUNG MAKROMOLEKULARER SUSPENSIONSMITTEL | [2023/31] | English: | POLYMERISATION OF VINYLIDENE FLUORIDE IN WATER USING MACROMOLECULAR SUSPENDING AGENTS | [2023/31] | French: | POLYMÉRISATION DE FLUORURE DE VINYLIDÈNE DANS DE L'EAU À L'AIDE D'AGENTS DE SUSPENSION MACROMOLÉCULAIRES | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 24.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2014071144 (ARKEMA INC [US]) [X] 12* claims 5,6 *; | [XDA]WO2016041808 (SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS IT [IT]) [XD] 11,13,14 * claims 1,6,9, 12, 13 * [A] 1-10,12; | [XA]WO2018114753 (SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS IT [IT]) [X] 11,13-16 * claims 1,4,9, 11-15 * [A] 1-10,12 | by applicant | WO2016041808 | EP20200197702 |