EP4210734 - HETEROLOGOUS PRIME BOOST VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLLMANN, Guido 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 02 /
DAS, Krishna 6020 Innsbruck / AT | 03 /
DEROUAZI, Madiha 1205 Geneva / CH | 04 /
BELNOUE, Elodie 1205 Geneva / CH | 05 /
ELBERS, Knut 6063 Rum / AT | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Lutze, Oliver, et al Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/29] | Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21773815.2 | 14.09.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021EP75184 | Priority number, date | EP20200195872 | 14.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20195872 | EP20200210671 | 30.11.2020 Original published format: EP 20210671 | EP20210155814 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: EP 21155814 | EP20210176373 | 27.05.2021 Original published format: EP 21176373 | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022053703 | Date: | 17.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4210734 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/385, A61P35/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
A61K39/0011 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/766 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/12 (IL,US);
A61K47/646 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/04 (IL,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K14/473 (IL,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/575 (IL,US);
A61K2039/6031 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/64 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/836 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2319/10 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2710/20022 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2710/20034 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2760/10022 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2760/20221 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2760/20222 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2760/20232 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2760/20243 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2760/20271 (EP,IL,KR);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Extension states | BA | 20.03.2023 | ME | 20.03.2023 | Validation states | MA | 20.03.2023 | TN | 20.03.2023 | Title | German: | HETEROLOGE PRIME-BOOST-VAKZINE | [2023/29] | English: | HETEROLOGOUS PRIME BOOST VACCINE | [2023/29] | French: | VACCIN DE TYPE PRIMOVACCINATION/RAPPEL HÉTÉROLOGUE | [2023/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 20.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO2006008074 | WO2006083301 | WO2006121168 | WO2008132601 | WO2008156712 | WO2009044273 | WO2009101611 | US2009220532 | WO2009114335 | WO2010004052 | WO2010040526 | EP2320940 | WO2011066389 | WO2011101332 | US8008449 | WO2012048190 | US8217149 | EP2476440 | EP1913954 | US8354509 | WO2013079174 | WO2013102144 | WO2013120073 | WO2015112900 | WO2015112800 | US9539321 | WO2017019896 | US2018133327 | US20130331546 |