EP4204564 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CD123 MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vor Biopharma Inc. 100 Cambridgepark Drive, Suite 400 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYDEARD, John Sharon, MA 02067 / US | 02 /
LUO, Chong Boston, MA 02127 / US | 03 /
LIN, Michelle Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 04 /
MISHRA, Bibhu, Prasad Wakefield, MA 01880 / US | 05 /
LISLE, Jessica, Evelyn Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21773967.1 | 27.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US47964 | Priority number, date | US202063071993P | 28.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063071993 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022047165 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4204564 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N5/078, A61K35/14 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
C12N15/1138 (EP);
A61K35/28 (US);
A61K35/14 (EP);
C12N15/111 (US);
C12N5/0647 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR CD123-MODIFIKATION | [2023/27] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CD123 MODIFICATION | [2023/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR MODIFICATION DE CD123 | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 24.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2020047164 (VOR BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2020150534 (BEAM THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [XI]WO2020168122 (BEAM THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [XP]WO2021041977 (VOR BIOPHARMA INC [US]); | by applicant | WO2013176772 | WO2014093694 | WO2015140268 | WO2015157070 | WO2016089433 | WO2016164356 | WO2017066760 | WO2017214460 | WO2018126176 | WO2018160768 | WO2018165629 | US2018312825 | US2018312828 | WO2019046285 | WO2016US57339 |