EP4086361 - HIGH-STRENGTH HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Hideyuki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
MORIYASU, Noriaki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
GOTO, Sota c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 21774000.0 | 17.03.2021 | [2022/45] | WO2021JP10938 | Priority number, date | JP20200053545 | 25.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020053545 | [2022/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021193310 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086361 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/46, C22C38/00, C22C38/06, C22C38/60 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR,US);
B21C47/02 (KR,US);
C21D1/02 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D8/0242 (EP);
C21D8/0263 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/008 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP,KR);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES HEISSGEWALZTES STAHLBLECH UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/45] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/45] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER LAMINÉE À CHAUD À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2022 | Translation filed | 03.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2011052321 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-4 * entire text *; | [A]US2014299237 (SOMANI MAHESH CHANDRA [FI], et al) [A] 1-4* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2016211073 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-4 * entire text *; | [A]JP2017179540 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-4 * entire text *; | [A]WO2019031583 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * entire text * | by applicant | JP2014189808 | JP2015155572 | JP2016211073 |