EP4130609 - HEAT PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Power Technology Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8311 / JP | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUDA Norihiro c/o YANMAR ENERGY SYSTEM CO., LTD., 1-9, Tsuruno- cho, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0014 / JP | 02 /
TSUJIKAWA Sachie c/o YANMAR ENERGY SYSTEM CO., LTD., 1-9, Tsuruno- cho, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0014 / JP | 03 /
AIKAWA Terunori c/o YANMAR ENERGY SYSTEM CO., LTD., 1-9, Tsuruno- cho, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0014 / JP | 04 /
OKADA Shingo 1-9, Tsuruno-cho, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0014 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21774509.0 | 01.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP07713 | Priority number, date | JP20200053962 | 25.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020053962 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021192828 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4130609 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F25B5/02, F25B5/04, F25B43/02, F25B1/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,KR);
F25B30/02 (KR);
F25B5/02 (KR,US);
F25B31/004 (KR);
F25B41/20 (EP);
F25B43/02 (KR);
F25B47/022 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B5/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | WÄRMEPUMPE | [2023/06] | English: | HEAT PUMP | [2023/06] | French: | POMPE À CHALEUR | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2022 | Translation filed | 11.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS57157973 (MATSUSHITA SEIKO KK) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2003074912 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 6-8 * paragraphs [0024] - [0032]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US8567203 (JANG JI YOUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 5,7,8* column 3, line 42 - column 6, line 17; figure 1 *; | [XYI]US2019137148 (MATSUDA TAKUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0030] - [0133]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 2,5-8 [I] 3,4 | International search | [Y]JPS57157973 (MATSUSHITA SEIKO KK) [Y] 2-8 * , p. 2, upper left column, line 7, to lower left column, line 18 *; | [Y]JP2006207982 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraph [0019], fig. 1 *; | [Y]JP2016099067 (YANMAR CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0011]-[0051], fig. 1 *; | [Y]WO2016088748 (TOSHIBA CARRIER CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-8* paraaraph [0007] fig. 2 *; | [Y]WO2018025318 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-8 * , paragraph [0085], fig. 1 * | by applicant | JP2016099067 | JP2020053962 |