EP4005207 - JOINT TRANSFORM CODING OF MULTIPLE COLOR COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEA, Sehoon c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Xin c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shan c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 21774963.9 | 24.02.2021 | [2022/22] | WO2021US19371 | Priority number, date | US202063000109P | 26.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063000109 P | US202017083662 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: US202017083662 | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021194679 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4005207 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/44, H04N19/18, H04N19/12, H04N19/61, H04N19/186 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H04N19/186 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/126 (KR,US);
H04N19/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/18 (EP);
H04N19/189 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/22] | H04N19/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Title | German: | GEMEINSAME TRANSFORMATIONSCODIERUNG MEHRERER FARBKOMPONENTEN | [2022/22] | English: | JOINT TRANSFORM CODING OF MULTIPLE COLOR COMPONENTS | [2022/22] | French: | CODAGE PAR TRANSFORMATION CONJOINTE DE MULTIPLES COMPOSANTS DE COULEUR | [2022/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - RUDAT CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Inter-Component Transform for Color Video Coding", 2019 PICTURE CODING SYMPOSIUM (PCS), IEEE, (20191112), doi:10.1109/PCS48520.2019.8954496, pages 1 - 5, XP033688128 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PCS48520.2019.8954496 | [A] - ZHAO (TENCENT) L ET AL, "CE7-related: unification for joint chroma residue coding modes", no. JVET-P0508, (20190925), 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P0508-v1.zip JVET-P0508/JVET-P0508.docx, (20190925), XP030217529 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - XIU (KWAI) X ET AL, "Combined encoder improvements of JVET-Q0101/JVET-Q0408/JVET-Q0514 on JCCR with chroma transform skip", no. JVET-Q0695 ; m52658, (20200116), 17. JVET MEETING; 20200107 - 20200117; BRUSSELS; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/17_Brussels/wg11/JVET-Q0695-v4.zip JVET-Q0695_r1.docx, (20200116), XP030224073 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - LAINEMA (NOKIA) J, "CE7: Joint coding of chrominance residuals (CE7-1)", no. JVET-N0054, (20190312), 14. JVET MEETING; 20190319 - 20190327; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/14_Geneva/wg11/JVET-N0054-v1.zip JVET-N0054.docx, (20190312), XP030254461 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - LAINEMA (NOKIA) J, "CE7-related: Joint coding of chrominance residuals", no. JVET-M0305, (20190116), 13. JVET MEETING; 20190109 - 20190118; MARRAKECH; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/13_Marrakech/wg11/JVET-M0305-v3.zip JVET-M0305-v2.docx, (20190116), XP030202337 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2019306522 (SAID AMIR [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * entire document (especially para [0038], [0048], [0051], [0136], [0141], [0143]) *; | [Y]US2019313097 (URBAN FABRICE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-20* entire document (especially para [0154], [0195], [0198]) * |