EP4106355 - TRANSMISSION MODE CONVERSION INDICATION METHOD, ACCESS NETWORK DEVICE, AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Zhenhua No.168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Yanxia No.168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Tomacelli 146 00186 Roma / IT | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 21776114.7 | 23.03.2021 | [2022/51] | WO2021CN82366 | Priority number, date | CN202010208861 | 23.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010208861 | [2022/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021190498 | Date: | 30.09.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106355 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.09.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04L12/18, H04W76/40, H04W28/06, H04W88/10 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H04W76/40 (EP,KR);
H04W4/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/06 (CN,KR,US);
H04L12/185 (EP,KR);
H04L12/189 (EP);
H04W88/10 (CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/51] | H04W4/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE EINER ÜBERTRAGUNGSMODUSUMWANDLUNG, ZUGANGSNETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | TRANSMISSION MODE CONVERSION INDICATION METHOD, ACCESS NETWORK DEVICE, AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2022/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION DE CONVERSION DE MODE DE TRANSMISSION, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2022/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2022 | Translation filed | 16.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 18.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019059074 (OZTURK OZCAN [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11,15 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0079] *[I] 2,7-9,13,14; | [XI]WO2019091456 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-9,11-15 * paragraph [0398] - paragraph [0455] * * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0230] * [I] 10; | [P]US2020267513 (ZHU YUANPING [CN], et al) [P] * paragraph [0398] - paragraph [0455] * * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0230] * | International search | [A]CN102651846 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-33 * entire document *; | [A]CN107371138 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-33 * description paragraphs [0116]-[0236] *; | [XY]CN108886669 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY) [X] 1-3, 5-17, 19-24, 26-33 * description, paragraphs [0028]-[0040] * [Y] 4, 18, 25; | [X]CN110651489 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 11-26, 28-29, 31-33 * description, paragraphs [0053]-[0064] *; | [XY]CN110809299 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [X] 1-3, 5-17, 19-24, 26-33 * description paragraphs [0078]-[0151] * [Y] 4, 18, 25; | [PX]US2021068003 (KADIRI PRASAD REDDY [US], et al) [PX] 20-26, 29, 32-33 * description paragraphs [0122]-[0150] *; | [Y] - Nokia, Nokia Shanghai Bell, "PDU session enhanced for multicast to provide the basic multicast connectivity service", 3GPP Draft; S2-1911366, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20191108), vol. SA WG2, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, XP051821458 [Y] 4, 18, 25 * section 2 * | [PX] - CATT, "Discussion on Dynamic PTM and PTP Switch with Service Continuity", 3GPP Draft; R2-2006594, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20200807), vol. RAN WG2, no. electronic; 20200817 - 20200828, XP051911529 [PX] 1-33 * section 2 * | [PX] - vivo, "KI #7, New Sol: Mode switch between multicast and unicast", 3GPP Draft; S2-2004106, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20200522), vol. SA WG2, no. e-meeting ;20200601 - 20200612, XP051890113 [PX] 1-33 * section 2 * | [A] - vivo, "Solution for multicast switch to unicast based on application level control", 3GPP Draft; S2-2000149, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20200107), vol. SA WG2, no. Seoul, Korea; 20200113 - 20200117, XP051842254 [A] 1-33 * section 2 * |