EP4208314 - MACHINE AND METHOD FOR RUNNING A MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | 03.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENDALL, Isabel 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | 02 /
VON MONKIEWITSCH, Matthias 6900 Bregenz / AT | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21777199.7 | 30.08.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021EP73878 | Priority number, date | EP20200193820 | 01.09.2020 Original published format: EP 20193820 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022049030 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208314 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
B25B21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER MASCHINE | [2023/28] | English: | MACHINE AND METHOD FOR RUNNING A MACHINE | [2023/28] | French: | MACHINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 03.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5609077 (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * column 5, line 37 - line 45 * * column 6, line 33 - line 37 * * column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 8 * [Y] 8; | [Y]US2008173139 (MIYAZAKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 8* paragraph [0006] *; | [X]US2013049643 (KUSAKAWA TAKUYA [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0112] *; | [X]EP2724821 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * | by applicant | US5003297 |