EP4214662 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR VERIFYING OWNERSHIP OF CRYPTO CURRENCY ASSETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | 24.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurospider Information Technology AG Winterthurerstrasse 92 8006 Zürich / CH | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄUBLE, Peter 8006 Zürich / CH | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21777317.5 | 15.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021EP75327 | Priority number, date | CH20200001180 | 18.09.2020 Original published format: CH 11802020 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022058347 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214662 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G06Q20/065 (EP);
G06Q20/02 (EP);
G06Q20/401 (EP);
G06Q20/403 (EP);
H04L63/102 (EP);
H04L63/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER EIGENTÜMERSCHAFT VON KRYPTOWÄHRUNGSMITTELN | [2023/30] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR VERIFYING OWNERSHIP OF CRYPTO CURRENCY ASSETS | [2023/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE VÉRIFICATION DE LA PROPRIÉTÉ D'ACTIFS DE CRYPTOMONNAIE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 13.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I] - Bitcoin Suisse AG, "Proof of Ownership - Deposit", Youtube, (20200412), page 1 pp., URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=JQDzHqZmna8&feature=emb_logo, (20210118), XP054981307 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * | [I] - Vitalik Buterin, "FACTS & FIGURES 2009, RECURRING FEATURE;2010 SRI C8052-13.410.1", (20100101), URL: https://cryptorating.eu/whitepapers/Ethereum/Ethereum_white_paper.pdf, (20210118), XP055491222 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * |