EP4203719 - FLAVOUR GLYCOSIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLLE, Theresa London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
SOFFE, Joanna London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21778190.5 | 27.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021GB52225 | Priority number, date | GB20200013412 | 27.08.2020 Original published format: GB 202013412 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022043698 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203719 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/30, A24D1/02, A24D1/20, A24F40/20 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A24B15/301 (EP);
A24D1/002 (KR,US);
A24B15/12 (US);
A24B15/30 (EP,KR);
A24B15/307 (KR);
A24B15/403 (KR,US);
A24D1/02 (EP,KR,US);
A24D1/20 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/20 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | GESCHMACKSGLYCOSID | [2023/27] | English: | FLAVOUR GLYCOSIDE | [2023/27] | French: | GLYCOSIDE D'ARÔME | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4612942 (DOBBERSTEIN ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,12,13 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 20 * * column 5, line 25 - line 68 * [A] 10,11,16-18 [I] 4,9,14,15; | [A]US4643205 (REDDING JERRY W [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * claims 1-24 *; | [XAI]CN102266125B (YI CEWEI) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,12-15 * the whole document * [A] 6,11,16-18 [I] 3,4,9,10; | [XAI]WO2014102070 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12-15 * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 4 * * page 1, line 25 - line 33 * * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 33 * * page 6, line 20 - line 25 * [A] 6,11,16-18 [I] 4,9,10; | [A]WO2020025728 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]) [A] 1-18* page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 26 * | by applicant | WO2018019855 |