EP4185233 - AN ORTHODONTIC DEVICE FOR CRANIAL ADAPTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 07.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomax S.p.a. Via Zamenhof, 615 36100 Vicenza (VI) / IT | For all designated states Gruppo Europeo di Ortodonzia S.r.l. Via Cropani, 188, A/B 00173 Roma (RM) / IT | For all designated states OP S.r.l. Via Emilia Ospizio, 118 42122 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRAFIELLO, Alessandro 42023 Cadelbosco Di Sopra (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21778580.7 | 16.07.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021IT00037 | Priority number, date | IT20200018034 | 24.07.2020 Original published format: IT202000018034 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022018773 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4185233 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/08, A61C7/36, A61C7/10 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A61C7/08 (EP,US);
A61C7/10 (EP,US);
A61C7/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | ORTHODONTISCHE VORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHÄDELANPASSUNGEN | [2023/22] | English: | AN ORTHODONTIC DEVICE FOR CRANIAL ADAPTATIONS | [2023/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ORTHODONTIQUE POUR ADAPTATIONS CRÂNIENNES | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 14.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 12.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2023 | 31.07.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO2014012827 (ALGLAVE MICHEL [FR]); | [XAY]US2017325913 (BERGERSEN EARL O [US]); | [XAYI]CN110025388 (UNIV SICHUAN); | [Y]US2020093571 (SHANJANI YASER [US], et al) |