EP4125902 - TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF DEXTROMETHORPHAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shinkei Therapeutics, Inc. 303A College Road East Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORSADIA, Suresh 3 Colonial Court Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 02 /
PATEL, Kalpana 16 Garnet Lane West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US | 03 /
TAN, Hock, S. 7 Lavender Way East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 04 /
RAVAL, Krunal A/3, Jal Apartment Thakkarbapanagar Approach sagar Ahmedabad 38250 / IN | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21779317.3 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US24572 | Priority number, date | US202063001607P | 30.03.2020 Original published format: US 202063001607 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021202329 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125902 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K31/485, A61K31/07, A61K45/06, A61P1/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/7084 (EP,IL);
A61K9/7061 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/07 (EP,IL);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K47/32 (KR,US);
A61K9/7069 (EP,IL,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | A61K31/485, A61K9/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | TRANSDERMALE VERABREICHUNG VON DEXTROMETHORPHAN | [2023/06] | English: | TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF DEXTROMETHORPHAN | [2023/06] | French: | ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE DE DEXTROMÉTHORPHANE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2019070864 (SHINKEI THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al) | International search | [A]WO9608229 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US5985317 (VENKATESHWARAN SRINIVASAN [US], et al); | [A]US6335030 (HOECK ULLA [DK], et al); | [A]WO2010005507 (AFGIN PHARMA LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2019070864 (SHINKEI THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al); | [A]WO2019209940 (SHINKEI THERAPEUTICS LLC [US], et al) |