EP3968547 - DATA TRANSCEIVING CONTROL METHOD AND APPLICATION SYSTEM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sungrow Power Supply Co., Ltd. No.1699 Xiyou Rd. New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Sungrow Power Supply Co., Ltd. No.1699 Xiyou Rd., New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Yuqing No. 1699 Xiyou Rd., New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | 02 /
ZHUANG, Jiacai No. 1699 Xiyou Rd., New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | 03 /
ZHUANG, Fushuai No. 1699 Xiyou Rd., New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | 04 /
ZHUANG, Yuan No. 1699 Xiyou Rd., New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | 05 /
XU, Jun No. 1699 Xiyou Rd., New & High Technology Industrial Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 21780485.5 | 16.03.2021 | [2022/11] | WO2021CN80992 | Priority number, date | CN202010238233 | 30.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010238233 | [2022/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021197044 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968547 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/278, H04L5/16 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04B10/2589 (EP);
H04B10/25759 (US);
H04B10/278 (EP);
H04B10/40 (CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | H04B10/25, H04B10/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | DATENEMPFANGS-ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNGSSYSTEM DAFÜR | [2022/11] | English: | DATA TRANSCEIVING CONTROL METHOD AND APPLICATION SYSTEM THEREFOR | [2022/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ÉMISSION-RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES ET SYSTÈME D'APPLICATION À CET EFFET | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2021 | Translation filed | 12.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0671833 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * column 4, line 37 - column 14, line 3 * * column 15, line 41 - column 22, line 44 * * figure 7 * [I] 3-7,11,14; | [I]US2005201305 (SHIBATA YUKINARI [JP], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0113] - [0130] ** figure 1 *; | [I]US2008152024 (TAKEUCHI JUNICHI [JP]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0052] * * figure 3 * | International search | [X]CN101635712 (COMBA TELECOM SYS CN HOLDINGS) [X] 1-14 * description page 5 line 6 - page 8 line 18 *; | [X]CN101686083 (ASIA OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * description page 5 line 27 - page 8 line 8 *; | [A]CN101785282 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]JP2010239313 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-14* entire document *; | [X]CN105515615 (ZHEJIANG GETTONE ELECTRON & TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * description, paragraphs [0011]-[0014] *; | [PX]CN111431605 (SUNGROW POWER SUPPLY CO LTD) [PX] 1-14 * claims 1-14 * |