EP4131544 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE-CONTAINING LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 2-7-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-6020 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 2-7-1, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-6020 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Junji c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED, 1-98, Kasugadenaka 3-chome, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-8558 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Chikara c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED, 5-1, Sobiraki-cho Niihama-shi, Ehime 792-8521 / JP | 03 /
HASHIWAKI, Hiroki c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED, 1-1, Oe- cho Niihama-shi, Ehime 792-0015 / JP | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21781163.7 | 18.03.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021JP11144 | Priority number, date | JP20200063857 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020063857 | [2023/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021200229 | Date: | 07.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4131544 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/20, H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, H01M10/0565, H01M10/0585, H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M10/056, H01M10/42, H01M10/0525, H01M50/414, H01M50/423, H01M50/434, H01M50/446, H01M50/497, H01B1/08, H01M10/058 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H01B1/08 (EP);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/628 (EP,US);
H01B1/20 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,KR);
H01M10/058 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/4235 (KR);
H01M50/586 (US);
H01M50/59 (US);
H01M2300/0068 (KR);
H01M2300/0071 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H01M10/0562, H01B1/06, H01M10/052, H01M10/0565, H01M10/058 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYTHALTIGE SCHICHT | [2023/06] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE-CONTAINING LAYER | [2023/06] | French: | COUCHE CONTENANT UN ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2022 | Translation filed | 22.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3389129 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7* paragraph [0323] - paragraph [0325]; claims 1-23; tables 1-3 * | International search | [Y]JP2003338321 (CENTRAL RES INST ELECT, et al) [Y] 1-8; | [XY]JP2019505961 [X] 1,3-8 * [0022], [0102]-[0104], [0116]-[0117], 1 [0022], [0102]-[0104], [0116]-[0117], 1 * [Y] 1-8; | [A]WO2019093461 (AIST [JP])[A] 1-8; | [A]JP2019179602 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO HOLDINGS INC, et al) [A] 1-8; | [A]JP2020009548 (KAWAKAMI SOICHIRO) [A] 1-8 | by applicant | JP2019102301 | JP2019199394 | - MELINDA B. GIESELMANJOHN R. REYNOLDS, "Poly[(p-phenyleneterephthalamido)propanesulfonate]: a new polyelectrolyte for application to conducting molecular composites", Macromolecules, (19900000), vol. 23, pages 3118 - 3124 |